Torres et al v. Avco Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Torres, Melinda Green and Samantha Walker Perry
Defendant: Avco Corporation and Lycoming Engines
Case Number: 1:2019cv02264
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. (McCune, Brandon)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tracy H. Fowler - filed by Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. (McCune, Brandon)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tracy H. Fowler filed by Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/31/2020. (dlw)
January 31, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tracy H. Fowler for Avco Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Melinda Green, Gregory Torres, Samantha Walker Perry re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Farnan, Brian)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Melinda Green, Gregory Torres, Samantha Walker Perry.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/6/2020. (Farnan, Brian)
January 30, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael S. Miska for Melinda Green, Gregory Torres, and Samantha Walker Perry added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
January 28, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 7 has been replaced on the docket at the request of counsel. (dlw)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Miska filed by Samantha Walker Perry, Gregory Torres, Melinda Green. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/28/2020. (dlw)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Miska - filed by Melinda Green, Gregory Torres, Samantha Walker Perry. (Farnan, Brian) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/28/2020) (dlw).
January 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elaine D. Solomon for Avco Corporation and Lycoming Engines added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(McCune, Brandon)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elaine D. Solomon - filed by Avco Corporation. (McCune, Brandon)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elaine D. Solomon filed by Avco Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for AVCO Corporation and Lycoming Engines (an unincorporated division of AVCO Corporation) to RESPOND to the Complaint to January 16, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Avco Corporation answer due 1/16/2020; Lycoming Engines answer due 1/16/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for AVCO Corporation and Lycoming Engines (an unincorporated division of AVCO Corporation) to RESPOND to the Complaint to January 16, 2020 - filed by Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. (McCune, Brandon)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. McCune on behalf of Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines (McCune, Brandon)
December 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2799883.) - filed by Gregory Torres, Samantha Walker Perry, Melinda Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)
December 12, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Avco Corporation on 12/12/2019; Lycoming Engines on 12/12/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres et al v. Avco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avco Corporation
Represented By: Brandon W. McCune
Represented By: Elaine D. Solomon
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming Engines
Represented By: Brandon W. McCune
Represented By: Elaine D. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Torres
Represented By: Joseph James Farnan, III
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael S. Miska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Green
Represented By: Joseph James Farnan, III
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael S. Miska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Walker Perry
Represented By: Joseph James Farnan, III
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael S. Miska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?