Owenxpress, LLC v. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: OWENXPRESS, LLC and Owenxpress LLC
Defendant: DUSTIN SMITH and XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02280
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc..(Wetzel, Benjamin)
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Wetzel, III on behalf of All Defendants (Wetzel, Benjamin)
February 6, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mary E. Reeves for Owenxpress LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on XPO on 12/11/2019, filed by Owenxpress LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Daly, Daniel) Modified on 2/6/2020 (nms).
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary E. Reeves, Esq., filed by Owenxpress LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2020. (nms)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary E. Reeves, Esq. - filed by Owenxpress LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(Daly, Daniel)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance (D.I. #10 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew. Certifications by counsel must contain the contact information for the attorney being moved. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2020. (nms)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary E. Reeves - filed by Owenxpress LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(Daly, Daniel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Daly on behalf of Owenxpress LLC (Daly, Daniel)
December 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/16/2020. (amf)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-20754. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting request to transfer this action to the District of Deleware. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/16/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/17/2019.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Mary Reeves, Esquire addressed to the Honorable Judge Renee M. Bumb Requesting Case be Moved to the Unites States District Court of Delaware dated December 13 2019. (REEVES, MARY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/17/2019.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff shall show cause, by written submission within 14 days of the date of this Order, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of venue, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/2/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/17/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OWENXPRESS, LLC. (REEVES, MARY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/17/2019.]
November 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/17/2019.]
November 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/17/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DUSTIN SMITH, XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/17/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/17/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUSTIN SMITH, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10140040), filed by OWENXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REEVES, MARY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owenxpress, LLC v. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUSTIN SMITH
Represented By: Benjamin C. Wetzel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Wetzel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWENXPRESS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owenxpress LLC
Represented By: Mary E. Reeves
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?