Sisvel International S.A. et al v. Tesla, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sisvel International S.A. and 3G Licensing S.A.
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02288
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to March 11, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Tesla, Inc. answer due 3/11/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/29/2020. (dlw)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to March 11, 2020 - filed by 3G Licensing S.A., Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Neil A. Benchell for 3G Licensing S.A. and Sisvel International S.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil Benchell filed by Sisvel International S.A. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/6/2020. (dlw)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to February 10, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Tesla, Inc. answer due 2/10/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/6/2020. (dlw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil Benchell - filed by Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to February 10, 2020 - filed by Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy)
December 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sisvel International S.A., 3G Licensing S.A.. Tesla, Inc. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Devlin, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sisvel International S.A. for 3G Licensing S.A. filed by 3G Licensing S.A., Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Fineur International S.A. for Sisvel International S.A. filed by 3G Licensing S.A., Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy)
December 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Tesla, Inc. on 12/18/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attached. (myr)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Tesla, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2804179.) - filed by Sisvel International S.A., 3G Licensing S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisvel International S.A. et al v. Tesla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sisvel International S.A.
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Neil A. Benchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3G Licensing S.A.
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Neil A. Benchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?