Jason et al v. JNJ Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Jason and Daniel Jason
Defendant: JNJ Express, Inc. and Brian Keith Winningham
Case Number: 1:2019cv02311
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02186-CFC, 1:19-cv-02311-CFC(cak)
February 11, 2020 The 2/13/2020 Scheduling Conference is cancelled per the entry of the Scheduling Order at D.I. 19 in Lead Case No. 19-2119-CFC. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02119-CFC, 1:19-cv-02186-CFC, 1:19-cv-02311-CFC(nmf)
January 28, 2020 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:19-cv-02119-CFC. ALL FUTURE FILINGS RELATING TO DISCOVERY SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 19-2119-CFC ONLY. (nmf)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SO ORDERED, re (10 in 1:19-cv-02186-CFC) MOTION to Consolidate Cases for discovery purposes only filed by JNJ Express, Inc., (16 in 1:19-cv-02119-CFC) MOTION to Consolidate Cases for discovery purposes only filed by JNJ Express, Inc., (3 in 1:19-cv-02311-CFC) MOTION to Consolidate Cases for discovery purposes only filed by JNJ Express, Inc. ALL FUTURE FILINGS RELATING TO DISCOVERY SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 19-2119-CFC ONLY. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02119-CFC, 1:19-cv-02186-CFC, 1:19-cv-02311-CFC(nmf)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for discovery purposes only - filed by JNJ Express, Inc.. (Callaway, Justin)
December 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 20, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to JNJ Express, Inc. on 12/20/2019; Brian Keith Winningham on 12/20/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against JNJ Express, Inc., Brian Keith Winningham - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2807182.) - filed by Daniel Jason, Susan Jason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason et al v. JNJ Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNJ Express, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Keith Winningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Jason
Represented By: Adam F. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jason
Represented By: Adam F. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?