Allergan USA, Inc. et al v. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited et al
Plaintiff: Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited and Gedeon Richter Plc.
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Cadila Healthcare Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Sun Pharma Global FZE and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02317
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2020. (nms)
January 28, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 27, 2020 - filed by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited, Gedeon Richter Plc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Gedeon Richter Plc.: For Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Gedeon Richter Plc.: For Cadila Healthcare Limited waiver sent on 1/28/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Gedeon Richter Plc.: For Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Gedeon Richter Plc.: For Aurobindo Pharma Limited waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 20, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aurobindo Pharma Limited on 12/20/2019; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 12/20/2019; Cadila Healthcare Limited on 12/20/2019; Sun Pharma Global FZE on 12/20/2019; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited on 12/20/2019; Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. on 12/20/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited - filed by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited, Gedeon Richter Plc. (kmd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,737,142 B2; 7,943,621 B2. (kmd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/11/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: see attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 3/17/2023. (kmd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/8/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: see attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 3/17/2023. (kmd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/12/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: see attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 3/17/2023. (kmd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed against Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2807668.) - filed by Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Gedeon Richter Plc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allergan USA, Inc. et al v. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gedeon Richter Plc.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadila Healthcare Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?