Kaleasy Tech LLC v. RingCentral, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kaleasy Tech LLC
Defendant: RingCentral, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02329
Filed: December 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complant to March 9, 2020 filed by Kaleasy Tech LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: RingCentral, Inc. answer due 3/9/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/7/2020. (fms)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complant to March 9, 2020 - filed by Kaleasy Tech LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaleasy Tech LLC. RingCentral, Inc. served on 12/24/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02328-CFC through 1:19-cv-02333-CFC (rjb)
December 23, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to RingCentral, Inc. on 12/23/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
December 22, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Kaleasy Tech LLC. (mal)
December 22, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 7,899,479 B2. (mal)
December 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
December 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against RingCentral, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2808329.) - filed by Kaleasy Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaleasy Tech LLC v. RingCentral, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RingCentral, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleasy Tech LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?