Friday-Dillard v. Christiana Care Health System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Regina Friday-Dillard
Defendant: Christiana Care Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02338
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jocelyn R. Cuttino, Emily Cuneo DeSmedt, and Elizabeth A. Johnson filed by Christiana Care Health System, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/13/20. (ntl)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jocelyn R. Cuttino, Emily Cuneo DeSmedt, and Elizabeth A. Johnson - filed by Christiana Care Health System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice of Jocelyn R. Cuttino, #2 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice of Emily Cuneo DeSmedt, #3 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth A. Johnson)(Barillare, Jody)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Christiana Care Health System, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Barillare, Jody)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) - filed by Christiana Care Health System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barillare, Jody)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to February 11, 2020 filed by Christiana Care Health System, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/23/20. (ntl)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to February 11, 2020 - filed by Christiana Care Health System, Inc.. (Barillare, Jody)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Barillare on behalf of Christiana Care Health System, Inc. (Barillare, Jody)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Regina Friday-Dillard. Christiana Care Health System, Inc. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Fletcher, William)
December 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 23, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to Delaware office per filing party's request. (myr)
December 23, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Christiana Care Health System, Inc. on 12/23/2019 (2 copies issued). Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Christiana Care Health System, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2808673.) - filed by Regina Friday-Dillard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friday-Dillard v. Christiana Care Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Care Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Friday-Dillard
Represented By: William D. Fletcher, Jr.
Represented By: Gary E. Junge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?