Duet Group Limited v. Colony Capital, LLC

Petitioner: Duet Group Limited
Respondent: Colony Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019mc00049
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1782
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Duet Group Limited shall have a two week extension of time to reply to Colony Capital, LLC'S response to Thursday, May 2, 2019 filed by Duet Group Limited, Set Briefing Schedule: re #1 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (Reply Brief due 5/2/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/15/2019. (fms)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Duet Group Limited shall have a two week extension of time to reply to Colony Capital, LLC'S response to Thursday, May 2, 2019 - filed by Duet Group Limited. (Fasic, G.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #8 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Jaclyn C. Levy by Colony Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Norman, Stephen)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #8 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Matthew Bunting by Colony Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Norman, Stephen)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MEMORANDUM in Support, #1 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by Colony Capital, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/18/2019. (Norman, Stephen)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Respondent's time to respond to the Application is extended to April 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/3/2019. (nmf)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to the Honorable Colm F. Connolly from G. Kevin Fasic, Equire regarding Colony Capital's request for additional time - re #5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory . (Fasic, G.)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory - filed by Colony Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norman, Stephen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Application, Declaration of John Paul Fulco, Memorandum of Law and a copy of the Court's Oral Order served on Barthelemy Holdings, LLC and Colony Capital, LLC's respective Delaware Registered Agents on 3/21/19, filed by Duet Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fasic, G.)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER, Applicant has not offered any good reason to proceed ex parte. Accordingly, Applicant is directed to serve all papers, including a copy of this oral order, on Barthelemy Holdings LLC, and to file a proof of service. Barthelemy Holdings LLC has two weeks to respond after service. Failure to timely respond will result in the Application being granted. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/21/2019. (nmf)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 1, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (lak)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION in Support re: D.I. #1 by Duet Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (lak)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re: D.I. #1 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by Duet Group Limited. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/15/2019. (lak)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 Ex Parte Application of Duet Group Limited for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 granting leave to obtain Discovery for use in a Foreign proceeding - filed by Duet Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duet Group Limited v. Colony Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colony Capital, LLC
Represented By: Stephen C. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Duet Group Limited
Represented By: G. Kevin Fasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?