YPF S.A. et al v. Maxus Liquidating Trust
Appellant: YPF S.A., CLH Holdings, Inc., YPF International S.A., YPF Holdings, Inc., Repsol E&P T&T Limited, Repsol USA Holdings Corp., Repsol Services Company, Repsol E&P USA, Inc., Repsol Offshore E&P USA, Inc., Repsol, S.A. and Repsol Exploracion, S.A.
Appellee: Maxus Liquidating Trust
Debtor: Maxus Energy Corporation, et al.
Case Number: 1:2019mc00051
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF re #1 Motion for Leave to Appeal, by CLH Holdings, Inc., YPF Holdings, Inc., YPF International S.A., YPF S.A.. (McGuire, Matthew) Modified on 4/11/2019 (nms).
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY BRIEF re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal (see motion in 19mc-52-RGA, D.I. #1 ), filed by Repsol, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Butz, Daniel) Modified on 4/10/2019 (nms). Modified on 4/11/2019 (nms).
April 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vices Attorney Brett L. Bakemeyer, Thomas MacWright, Matthew Nicholson, J. Christopher Shore, and Erin M. Smith for Maxus Liquidating Trust added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers.(ddp)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Maxus Liquidating Trust.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Farnan, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Christopher Shore, Thomas MacWright, Erin M. Smith, Matthew Nicholson, and Brett L. Bakemeyer, filed by Maxus Liquidating Trust. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2019. (nms)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Christopher Shore, Thomas MacWright, Erin M. Smith, Matthew Nicholson, and Brett L. Bakemeyer - filed by Maxus Liquidating Trust. (Farnan, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 Stipulation to Extend Word Count. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2019. (nms)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Word Count by Maxus Liquidating Trust. (Farnan, Michael)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Answering Brief due 3/29/2019, Reply Brief due 4/10/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2019. (nms)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 2 in 19-mc-52-RGA; D.I. 2 in 19-mc-51-RGA) Stipulation to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00051-RGA, 1:19-mc-00052-RGA(nms)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (i) for the Appellee to file Answering Briefs in response to Appellants' Motions for Leave to Appeal and (ii) for the Appellants to file their reply briefs in support of the Motions to (i) 3/29/2019 and (ii) 4/10/2019 - filed by Maxus Liquidating Trust. (Farnan, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION to Consolidate by Maxus Liquidating Trust. (Farnan, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00051-RGA, 1:19-mc-00052-RGA (rjb)
March 4, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2019. (nms)
March 4, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal - filed by CLH Holdings, Inc., YPF Holdings, Inc., YPF International S.A., YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #2 Order on Appeal, #3 Letter Opinion, #4 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YPF S.A. et al v. Maxus Liquidating Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: YPF S.A.
Represented By: Adam G. Landis
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew B. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CLH Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Adam G. Landis
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew B. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: YPF International S.A.
Represented By: Adam G. Landis
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew B. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: YPF Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Adam G. Landis
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew B. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Repsol E&P T&T Limited
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Robert J. Dehney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Repsol USA Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Robert J. Dehney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Repsol Services Company
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Robert J. Dehney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Repsol E&P USA, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Robert J. Dehney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Repsol Offshore E&P USA, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Robert J. Dehney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Repsol, S.A.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Robert J. Dehney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Repsol Exploracion, S.A.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Robert J. Dehney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Maxus Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: J. Christopher Shore
Represented By: Matthew Nicholson
Represented By: Brett L. Bakemeyer
Represented By: Thomas MacWright
Represented By: Erin M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Maxus Energy Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?