Gamble v. United States District Court of Delaware

Plaintiff: Wayne T. Gamble
Defendant: United States District Court Of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2019mc00093
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/28/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00225-LPS et al.(lak)
May 13, 2019 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:17-cv-00225-LPS. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00854-UNA et al.(rwc)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Complaint (Pro Se) filed by Wayne T. Gamble. The Plaintiff may file a new complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to open this matteras a new civil action. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/7/19. (sar)
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 12, 2019 Remark: Case submitted to Pro-Se Law Clerk and for Routine Judicial Case Assignment. (ceg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against United States District Court Of Delaware (*IFP attached)(*Refused to complete Motion for Leave to File Complaint) - filed by Wayne T. Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. United States District Court of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne T. Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court Of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?