In re: Letter Request from India

Petitioner: Rakhi Bhansali
Respondent: Twin Fields Investments Limited
Case Number: 1:2019mc00094
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1782
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #7 . (nmf)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 APPLICATION for Order for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (28 U.S.C. 1782). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/26/2019. (nmf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by Rakhi Bhansali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Casarino, Marc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rakhi Bhansalis Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 filed by Rakhi Bhansali.(Casarino, Marc)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER, Applicant has not offered any good reason to proceed ex parte. Accordingly, Applicant is directed to serve all papers, including a copy of this oral order, on Twin Fields Investments Limited, and to file a proof of service. Twin Fields Investments Limited has two weeks to respond after service. Failure to timely respond will result in the Application being granted. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/8/2019. (nmf)
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 12, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (ceg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Thomas E. Butler in Support of D.I. #1 Application for Order for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (28 U.S.C. 1782) - filed by Rakhi Bhansali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ceg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of D.I. #1 Application for Order for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (28 U.S.C. 1782) - filed by Rakhi Bhansali. (ceg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Order for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (28 U.S.C. 1782) (*Filing Fee $47, Receipt Number 0311-2618551) - filed by Rakhi Bhansali. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Definitions & Instructions, #3 Exhibit Definitions, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Letter Request from India
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rakhi Bhansali
Represented By: Marc Stephen Casarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Twin Fields Investments Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?