In re: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lanier Plaintiffs, Certain Talc Plaintiffs and Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases
Petitioner: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Respondent: Donna and Jerry Farra
Debtor: Imerys Talc America, Inc., et al.
Case Number: 1:2019mc00103
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Remark - D.I. 90 has been unsealed pursuant to D.I. #95 . (dlw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits 2 and 8 with Respect to Lanier Law FirmPlaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Fix Venue by Lanier Plaintiffs re #87 Sur-Reply Brief, #90 Exhibit to a Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
June 11, 2019 Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Wing Chan, Noticing Coordinator of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC re #64 Declaration, #77 Redacted Document, #66 Declaration filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 6/12/2019 (dlw).
June 6, 2019 Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT of Forrest Kuffer, Noticing Coordinator, Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC re #76 Exhibit to a Document, #75 Exhibit to a Document, #70 Exhibit to a Document, #64 Declaration, #69 Exhibit to a Document, #67 Exhibit to a Document, #72 Exhibit to a Document, #73 Exhibit to a Document, #74 Exhibit to a Document, #77 Redacted Document, #66 Declaration, #68 Exhibit to a Document, #71 Exhibit to a Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 6/6/2019 (dlw).
June 5, 2019 Filing 92 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Davis Lee Wright, Counsel fot the Official Committee of Tort Claimants regarding Additional Supplemental Authorities - re #78 Letter, #46 Memorandum in Opposition, #1 MOTION to Change Venue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Wright, Davis)
June 5, 2019 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT of Michelle M. Dero re #87 Sur-Reply Brief, #89 Motion to Seal filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #89 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document: #87 Sur-Reply Brief // Exhibits 2 and 8 filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/5/2019. (dlw)
June 4, 2019 Filing 90 EXHIBITS 2 and 8 re #87 Sur-Reply Brief by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark) Modified on 6/5/2019 (dlw). Modified on 6/27/2019 (dlw).
June 4, 2019 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document: #87 Sur-Reply Brief // Exhibits 2 and 8 - filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Order)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark) Modified on 6/5/2019 (dlw).
June 4, 2019 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Lean C. Kagan re #86 Sur-Reply Brief by Certain Talc Plaintiffs. (deBruin, David) Modified on 6/5/2019 (dlw).
June 4, 2019 Filing 87 SUR-REPLY BRIEF re #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 9)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
June 4, 2019 Filing 86 SUR-REPLY BRIEF re #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Certain Talc Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(deBruin, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 85 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #1 MOTION to Change Venue. (Kortanek, Steven)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORAL ORDER - Having reviewed the Objections #79 filed by the Lanier Plaintiffs, the letter #80 filed by the Responding Plaintiffs (as defined in n.2 of #82 ), and the Johnson & Johnson parties Opposition to both #82 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 6/4/2019, both the Lanier Plaintiffs and the Responding Plaintiffs may file a sur-reply brief of no more than 5 pages. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/28/2019. (dlw)
May 28, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 79 has been replaced on the docket with a version that complies with Local Rule 5.1.1(a). The footnotes now appear in 12 point type. (dlw)
May 28, 2019 Filing 83 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Steven K. Kortanek of Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP - re #80 Letter, #79 Objections,,,. (Kortanek, Steven)
May 28, 2019 Filing 82 OBJECTIONS // Opposition to Lanier Law Firm Plaintiff's Objections to and Motion to Exclude, Disregard, or Strike J&J's Reply Brief In Toto or, Alternatively Portions of J&J's Reply Brief and Attachments Thereto and Opposition to David deBruin's Letter Regarding Objections by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. to #80 Letter, #79 Objections. (Kortanek, Steven) Modified on 5/28/2019 (dlw).
May 28, 2019 Filing 81 REPLY BRIEF re #1 MOTION to Fix Venue for Claims filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (dlw)
May 28, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 63-1 - Reply Brief - has been replaced on the docket with a version that complies with Local Rule 5.1.1(a). The footnotes now appear in 12 point type. (dlw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 80 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from David deBruin regarding Objection - re #63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief, #1 MOTION to Change Venue, #65 MOTION to Seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(deBruin, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 79 OBJECTIONS and Motion to Exclude, Disregard, or Strike J&J's Reply Brief in Toto or, Alternatively Portions of J&J's Reply Brief and Attachments Thereto by Lanier Plaintiffs to #70 Exhibit to a Document, #69 Exhibit to a Document, #72 Exhibit to a Document, #73 Exhibit to a Document, #68 Exhibit to a Document, #65 MOTION to Seal, #76 Exhibit to a Document, #75 Exhibit to a Document, #64 Declaration, #67 Exhibit to a Document, #74 Exhibit to a Document, #77 Redacted Document, #63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief, #66 Declaration, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of D. Del. LR 7.1.3(c)(2), #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit 4 - J&J Response to OSC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Remand Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - J&J Opposition)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark) Modified on 5/28/2019 (dlw). (Main Document 79 replaced on 5/28/2019) (dlw).
May 24, 2019 Filing 78 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Natalie D. Ramsey, Counsel fot the Official Committee of Tort Claimants regarding Supplemental Authority Regarding Remand - re #46 Memorandum in Opposition, #1 MOTION to Change Venue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Ramsey, Natalie)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #65 MOTION to Seal filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/24/2019. (dlw)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/24/2019. (dlw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 77 REDACTED VERSION of #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 100 - 536 (Filed Under Seal))(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 24, 2019 Filing 76 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 495-536 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 495, #2 Exhibit 496, #3 Exhibit 497, #4 Exhibit 498, #5 Exhibit 499, #6 Exhibit 500, #7 Exhibit 501, #8 Exhibit 502, #9 Exhibit 503, #10 Exhibit 504, #11 Exhibit 505, #12 Exhibit 506, #13 Exhibit 507, #14 Exhibit 508, #15 Exhibit 509, #16 Exhibit 510, #17 Exhibit 511, #18 Exhibit 512, #19 Exhibit 513, #20 Exhibit 514, #21 Exhibit 515, #22 Exhibit 516, #23 Exhibit 517, #24 Exhibit 518, #25 Exhibit 519, #26 Exhibit 520, #27 Exhibit 521, #28 Exhibit 522, #29 Exhibit 523, #30 Exhibit 524, #31 Exhibit 525, #32 Exhibit 526, #33 Exhibit 527, #34 Exhibit 528, #35 Exhibit 529, #36 Exhibit 530, #37 Exhibit 531, #38 Exhibit 532, #39 Exhibit 533, #40 Exhibit 534, #41 Exhibit 535, #42 Exhibit 536)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 24, 2019 Filing 75 [SEALED] EXHIBIT 494 Part 4 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 494 part 4)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 24, 2019 Filing 74 [SEALED] EXHIBIT 494 Part 3 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 494 part 3)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 24, 2019 Filing 73 [SEALED] EXHIBIT 494 Part 2 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 494 part 2)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 24, 2019 Filing 72 [SEALED] EXHIBIT 494 Part 1 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 494 part 1)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 24, 2019 Filing 71 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 476-493 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 476, #2 Exhibit 477, #3 Exhibit 478, #4 Exhibit 479, #5 Exhibit 480, #6 Exhibit 481, #7 Exhibit 482, #8 Exhibit 483, #9 Exhibit 484, #10 Exhibit 485, #11 Exhibit 486, #12 Exhibit 487, #13 Exhibit 488, #14 Exhibit 489, #15 Exhibit 490, #16 Exhibit 491, #17 Exhibit 492, #18 Exhibit 493)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 24, 2019 Filing 70 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 401-475 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 401, #2 Exhibit 402, #3 Exhibit 403, #4 Exhibit 404, #5 Exhibit 405, #6 Exhibit 406, #7 Exhibit 407, #8 Exhibit 408, #9 Exhibit 409, #10 Exhibit 410, #11 Exhibit 411, #12 Exhibit 412, #13 Exhibit 413, #14 Exhibit 414, #15 Exhibit 415, #16 Exhibit 416, #17 Exhibit 417, #18 Exhibit 418, #19 Exhibit 419, #20 Exhibit 420, #21 Exhibit 421, #22 Exhibit 422, #23 Exhibit 423, #24 Exhibit 424, #25 Exhibit 425, #26 Exhibit 426, #27 Exhibit 427, #28 Exhibit 428, #29 Exhibit 429, #30 Exhibit 430, #31 Exhibit 431, #32 Exhibit 432, #33 Exhibit 433, #34 Exhibit 434, #35 Exhibit 435, #36 Exhibit 436, #37 Exhibit 437, #38 Exhibit 438, #39 Exhibit 439, #40 Exhibit 440, #41 Exhibit 441, #42 Exhibit 442, #43 Exhibit 443, #44 Exhibit 444, #45 Exhibit 445, #46 Exhibit 446, #47 Exhibit 447, #48 Exhibit 448, #49 Exhibit 449, #50 Exhibit 450, #51 Exhibit 451, #52 Exhibit 452, #53 Exhibit 453, #54 Exhibit 454, #55 Exhibit 455, #56 Exhibit 456, #57 Exhibit 457, #58 Exhibit 458, #59 Exhibit 459, #60 Exhibit 460, #61 Exhibit 461, #62 Exhibit 462, #63 Exhibit 463, #64 Exhibit 464, #65 Exhibit 465, #66 Exhibit 466, #67 Exhibit 467, #68 Exhibit 468, #69 Exhibit 469, #70 Exhibit 470, #71 Exhibit 471, #72 Exhibit 472, #73 Exhibit 473, #74 Exhibit 474, #75 Exhibit 475)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 23, 2019 Filing 69 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 301-400 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 301, #2 Exhibit 302, #3 Exhibit 303, #4 Exhibit 304, #5 Exhibit 305, #6 Exhibit 306, #7 Exhibit 307, #8 Exhibit 308, #9 Exhibit 309, #10 Exhibit 310, #11 Exhibit 311, #12 Exhibit 312, #13 Exhibit 313, #14 Exhibit 314, #15 Exhibit 315, #16 Exhibit 316, #17 Exhibit 317, #18 Exhibit 318, #19 Exhibit 319, #20 Exhibit 320, #21 Exhibit 321, #22 Exhibit 322, #23 Exhibit 323, #24 Exhibit 324, #25 Exhibit 325, #26 Exhibit 326, #27 Exhibit 327, #28 Exhibit 328, #29 Exhibit 329, #30 Exhibit 330, #31 Exhibit 331, #32 Exhibit 332, #33 Exhibit 333, #34 Exhibit 334, #35 Exhibit 336, #36 Exhibit 336, #37 Exhibit 337, #38 Exhibit 338, #39 Exhibit 339, #40 Exhibit 340, #41 Exhibit 341, #42 Exhibit 342, #43 Exhibit 343, #44 Exhibit 344, #45 Exhibit 345, #46 Exhibit 346, #47 Exhibit 347, #48 Exhibit 348, #49 Exhibit 349, #50 Exhibit 350, #51 Exhibit 351, #52 Exhibit 352, #53 Exhibit 353, #54 Exhibit 354, #55 Exhibit 355, #56 Exhibit 356, #57 Exhibit 357, #58 Exhibit 358, #59 Exhibit 359, #60 Exhibit 360, #61 Exhibit 361, #62 Exhibit 362, #63 Exhibit 363, #64 Exhibit 364, #65 Exhibit 365, #66 Exhibit 366, #67 Exhibit 367, #68 Exhibit 368, #69 Exhibit 369, #70 Exhibit 370, #71 Exhibit 371, #72 Exhibit 372, #73 Exhibit 373, #74 Exhibit 374, #75 Exhibit 375, #76 Exhibit 376, #77 Exhibit 377, #78 Exhibit 378, #79 Exhibit 379, #80 Exhibit 380, #81 Exhibit 381, #82 Exhibit 382, #83 Exhibit 383, #84 Exhibit 384, #85 Exhibit 385, #86 Exhibit 386, #87 Exhibit 387, #88 Exhibit 388, #89 Exhibit 389, #90 Exhibit 390, #91 Exhibit 391, #92 Exhibit 392, #93 Exhibit 393, #94 Exhibit 394, #95 Exhibit 395, #96 Exhibit 396, #97 Exhibit 397, #98 Exhibit 398, #99 Exhibit 399, #100 Exhibit 400)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 23, 2019 Filing 68 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 201-300 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 201, #2 Exhibit 202, #3 Exhibit 203, #4 Exhibit 204, #5 Exhibit 205, #6 Exhibit 206, #7 Exhibit 207, #8 Exhibit 208, #9 Exhibit 209, #10 Exhibit 210, #11 Exhibit 211, #12 Exhibit 212, #13 Exhibit 213, #14 Exhibit 214, #15 Exhibit 215, #16 Exhibit 216, #17 Exhibit 217, #18 Exhibit 218, #19 Exhibit 219, #20 Exhibit 220, #21 Exhibit 221, #22 Exhibit 222, #23 Exhibit 223, #24 Exhibit 224, #25 Exhibit 225, #26 Exhibit 226, #27 Exhibit 227, #28 Exhibit 228, #29 Exhibit 229, #30 Exhibit 230, #31 Exhibit 231, #32 Exhibit 232, #33 Exhibit 233, #34 Exhibit 234, #35 Exhibit 235, #36 Exhibit 236, #37 Exhibit 237, #38 Exhibit 238, #39 Exhibit 239, #40 Exhibit 240, #41 Exhibit 241, #42 Exhibit 242, #43 Exhibit 243, #44 Exhibit 244, #45 Exhibit 245, #46 Exhibit 246, #47 Exhibit 247, #48 Exhibit 248, #49 Exhibit 249, #50 Exhibit 250, #51 Exhibit 251, #52 Exhibit 252, #53 Exhibit 253, #54 Exhibit 254, #55 Exhibit 255, #56 Exhibit 256, #57 Exhibit 257, #58 Exhibit 258, #59 Exhibit 259, #60 Exhibit 260, #61 Exhibit 261, #62 Exhibit 262, #63 Exhibit 263, #64 Exhibit 264, #65 Exhibit 265, #66 Exhibit 266, #67 Exhibit 267, #68 Exhibit 268, #69 Exhibit 269, #70 Exhibit 270, #71 Exhibit 271, #72 Exhibit 272, #73 Exhibit 273, #74 Exhibit 274, #75 Exhibit 275, #76 Exhibit 276, #77 Exhibit 277, #78 Exhibit 278, #79 Exhibit 279, #80 Exhibit 280, #81 Exhibit 281, #82 Exhibit 282, #83 Exhibit 283, #84 Exhibit 284, #85 Exhibit 285, #86 Exhibit 286, #87 Exhibit 287, #88 Exhibit 288, #89 Exhibit 289, #90 Exhibit 290, #91 Exhibit 291, #92 Exhibit 292, #93 Exhibit 293, #94 Exhibit 294, #95 Exhibit 295, #96 Exhibit 296, #97 Exhibit 297, #98 Exhibit 298, #99 Exhibit 299, #100 Exhibit 300)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 23, 2019 Filing 67 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 100-200 re #66 Declaration by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 100, #2 Exhibit 101, #3 Exhibit 102, #4 Exhibit 103, #5 Exhibit 104, #6 Exhibit 105, #7 Exhibit 106, #8 Exhibit 107, #9 Exhibit 108, #10 Exhibit 109, #11 Exhibit 110, #12 Exhibit 111, #13 Exhibit 112, #14 Exhibit 113, #15 Exhibit 114, #16 Exhibit 115, #17 Exhibit 116, #18 Exhibit 117, #19 Exhibit 118, #20 Exhibit 119, #21 Exhibit 120, #22 Exhibit 121, #23 Exhibit 122, #24 Exhibit 123, #25 Exhibit 124, #26 Exhibit 125, #27 Exhibit 126, #28 Exhibit 127, #29 Exhibit 128, #30 Exhibit 129, #31 Exhibit 130, #32 Exhibit 131, #33 Exhibit 132, #34 Exhibit 133, #35 Exhibit 134, #36 Exhibit 135, #37 Exhibit 136, #38 Exhibit 137, #39 Exhibit 138, #40 Exhibit 139, #41 Exhibit 140, #42 Exhibit 141, #43 Exhibit 142, #44 Exhibit 143, #45 Exhibit 144, #46 Exhibit 145, #47 Exhibit 146, #48 Exhibit 147, #49 Exhibit 148, #50 Exhibit 149, #51 Exhibit 150, #52 Exhibit 151, #53 Exhibit 152, #54 Exhibit 153, #55 Exhibit 154, #56 Exhibit 155, #57 Exhibit 156, #58 Exhibit 157, #59 Exhibit 158, #60 Exhibit 159, #61 Exhibit 160, #62 Exhibit 161, #63 Exhibit 162, #64 Exhibit 163, #65 Exhibit 164, #66 Exhibit 165, #67 Exhibit 166, #68 Exhibit 167, #69 Exhibit 168, #70 Exhibit 169, #71 Exhibit 170, #72 Exhibit 171, #73 Exhibit 172, #74 Exhibit 173, #75 Exhibit 174, #76 Exhibit 175, #77 Exhibit 176, #78 Exhibit 177, #79 Exhibit 178, #80 Exhibit 179, #81 Exhibit 180, #82 Exhibit 181, #83 Exhibit 182, #84 Exhibit 183, #85 Exhibit 184, #86 Exhibit 185, #87 Exhibit 186, #88 Exhibit 187, #89 Exhibit 188, #90 Exhibit 189, #91 Exhibit 190, #92 Exhibit 191, #93 Exhibit 192, #94 Exhibit 193, #95 Exhibit 194, #96 Exhibit 195, #97 Exhibit 196, #98 Exhibit 197, #99 Exhibit 198, #100 Exhibit 199, #101 Exhibit 200)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 23, 2019 Filing 66 Supplemental DECLARATION John J. Nolan, Esq. re #1 MOTION to Change Venue by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 23, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Seal - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 23, 2019 Filing 64 Supplemental DECLARATION John H. Denton re #63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw).
May 23, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dlw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/28/2019) (dlw).
May 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shannon M. McNulty for Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin Hroblak for Certain Talc Plaintiffs added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Griffith on behalf of Certain Talc Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Griffith, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin Hroblak, Esquire filed by Certain Talc Plaintiffs. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/16/2019. (dlw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin Hroblak, Esquire - filed by Certain Talc Plaintiffs. (Griffith, Daniel)
May 15, 2019 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Michelle M. Dero re #57 MEMORANDUM in Support, #56 Response to Motion filed by Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 15, 2019 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT of Michelle M. Dero re #53 MEMORANDUM in Support, #50 Response to Motion filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Mark Lanier, Esquire, #43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin T. Major, Esquire, #44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin T. Parker, Esquire filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/14/2019. (dlw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Certain Talc Plaintiffs.Reply Brief due date per Stipulation is 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of David Greenstone, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Greenstone, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David Greenstone, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of David Greenstone, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of David Greenstone, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of David Greenstone, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of David Greenstone, #9 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of David Greenstone, #10 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of David Greenstone, #11 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of David Greenstone)(deBruin, David) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 Response to Motion filed by Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Consolidated Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Holman Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit 3 - Holman Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Bart Harris)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 55 JOINDER by Donna and Jerry Farra, joining in #46 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Fix Venue. (Miller, Rick)
May 13, 2019 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Ted G. Meadows, Esquire re #49 Memorandum in Opposition by Certain Talc Plaintiffs. (Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support re #50 Response to Motion filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. Reply Brief due date per Stipulation is 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Gov. Roy E. Barnes, Esquire re #49 Memorandum in Opposition by Certain Talc Plaintiffs. (Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Daniel A. Griffith, Esquire re #49 Memorandum in Opposition by Certain Talc Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lanier Law Firm Talc-Asbestos Plaintiffs)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Certain Talc Plaintiffs.Reply Brief due date per Stipulation is 5/23/2019. (Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 48 JOINDER by Future Claimants' Representative, joining in #46 Memorandum in Opposition of the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to J&J's Motion to Fix Venue. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zieg, Sharon) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Jeffrey B. Korn, Esq. re #46 Memorandum in Opposition by Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ramsey, Natalie) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Official Committee of Tort Claimants.Reply Brief due date per Stipulation is 5/23/2019. (Ramsey, Natalie) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 45 JOINDER by Certain Talc Plaintiffs, joining in #37 Answering Brief in Opposition, #1 Motion to Change Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(deBruin, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin T. Parker, Esquire - filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin T. Major, Esquire - filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Mark Lanier, Esquire - filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Griffith on behalf of Certain Talc Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Griffith, Daniel)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. McNulty, #39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael O'Neil, #38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John F. Kennedy filed by Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/13/2019. (dlw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. McNulty - filed by Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 10, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael O'Neil - filed by Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 10, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John F. Kennedy - filed by Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
May 10, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Certain Talc Plaintiffs. Reply Brief due date per Stipulation is 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(deBruin, David) Modified on 5/13/2019 (dlw).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tariq Mundiya filed by Official Committee of Tort Claimants. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/10/2019. (dlw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tariq Mundiya - filed by Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Wright, Davis)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #34 Memorandum Opinion DENYING #12 Emergency Provisional Transfer motion and DENYING #15 Motion for ex parte Relief. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/9/2019. (dlw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/9/2019. (dlw)
May 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexander Condon, Rachel Farnsworth, Ronit J. Berkovich, Marcia L. Goldstein, Diane P. Sullivan for Johnson & Johnson, for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 3, 2019 Filing 33 Letter to The Honorable Judge Maryelle Noreika from Thomas C Crumplar regarding Motion to Fix Venue. (Crumplar, Thomas)
May 3, 2019 Filing 32 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from David W. deBruin Esq. regarding Response of Certain Plaintiffs to J&J's Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer and Motion for Ex Parte Consideration - re #15 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion for Ex Parte Consideration and Immediate Entry of Order Granting Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for, #12 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5). (Attachments: #1 J&J Removed Case Chart)(deBruin, David)
May 3, 2019 Filing 31 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Natalie D. Ramsey regarding D.I. 31 - re #30 Letter,,. (Wright, Davis)
May 3, 2019 Filing 30 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Steven K. Kortanek regarding re DI 12. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31)(Kortanek, Steven)
May 2, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Wing Chan, Noticing Coordinator of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC re #14 Declaration, #16 Certificate of Service,, #15 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion for Ex Parte Consideration and Immediate Entry of Order Granting Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for, #13 MEMORANDUM in Support, #12 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5) Affidavit of Service filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick)
May 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey B. Korn for Official Committee of Tort Claimants added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 2, 2019 Filing 28 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Steven K. Kortanek regarding DI 17, 19 and 21 - re #21 Letter,, #19 Letter,, #17 Letter,,. (Jackson, Patrick)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachel C. Strickland, #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Enright, #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey B. Korn filed by Official Committee of Tort Claimants. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/2/2019. (dlw)
May 2, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc R. Abrams on behalf of Certain Talc Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Abrams, Marc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Enright - filed by Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Wright, Davis)
May 2, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey B. Korn - filed by Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Wright, Davis)
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachel C. Strickland - filed by Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Wright, Davis)
May 1, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Forrest Kuffer, Noticing Coordinator, Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC re #2 MEMORANDUM in Support, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration,, #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick)
May 1, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Wing Chan, Noticing Coordinator of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC re #2 MEMORANDUM in Support, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration,, #1 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick)
May 1, 2019 Filing 21 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Daniel A. Griffith regarding Opposing Provisional Transfer - re #15 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion for Ex Parte Consideration and Immediate Entry of Order Granting Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for, #13 MEMORANDUM in Support, #12 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Griffith, Daniel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Griffith on behalf of Certain Talc Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Griffith, Daniel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 19 Letter to Judge Maryellen Noreika from Thomas C. Crumplar, Esq. regarding Johnson & Johnson's Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer - re #14 Declaration, #15 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion for Ex Parte Consideration and Immediate Entry of Order Granting Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for, #13 MEMORANDUM in Support, #12 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5). (Crumplar, Thomas)
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Lee Wright on behalf of Official Committee of Tort Claimants (Wright, Davis)
May 1, 2019 Filing 17 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Natalie D. Ramsey regarding Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer - re #15 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion for Ex Parte Consideration and Immediate Entry of Order Granting Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for, #13 MEMORANDUM in Support, #12 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5). (Wright, Davis)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #14 Declaration, #15 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion for Ex Parte Consideration and Immediate Entry of Order Granting Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for, #13 MEMORANDUM in Support, #12 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5) (Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/1/2019 (dlw).
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion for Ex Parte Consideration and Immediate Entry of Order Granting Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfers Under 28 U.S.C. Section 127(b)(5) - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Argentina, Joseph) Modified on 5/1/2019 (dlw).
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Marihug Cedeno re #12 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/1/2019 (dlw).
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/14/2019. (Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 5/1/2019 (dlw).
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Expedite // Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Provisional Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5) - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kortanek, Steven) Modified on 5/1/2019 (dlw).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Response to May 13, 2019 and Reply to May 23, 2019. (Set Briefing Schedule: re #1 MOTION to Change Venue - Answering Brief due 5/13/2019. Reply Brief due 5/23/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/30/2019. (dlw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Response to May 13, 2019 and Reply to May 23, 2019 - filed by Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Wright, Davis) Modified on 4/30/2019 (dlw).
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick S. Miller on behalf of Donna and Jerry Farra (Miller, Rick)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachel Farnsworth, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander Condon, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marcia L. Goldstein, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Diane P. Sullivan, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronit J. Berkovich filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/25/2019. (dlw)
April 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00103-MN and 1:19-cv-00711-MN, 1:19-cv-00718-MN thru 1:19-cv-00721-MN, 1:19-cv-00723-MN, 1:19-cv-00724-MN and 1:19-cv-00726-MN thru 1:19-cv-00728-MN (rjb)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander Condon - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachel Farnsworth - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronit J. Berkovich - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marcia L. Goldstein - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kortanek, Steven)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Diane P. Sullivan - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kortanek, Steven)
April 18, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for Judicial assignment. (lak)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of John J. Nolan, Esq. in support of Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s MOTION Fix Venue for Claims - related to Imery's Bankruptcy under 28 U.S.C. re #1 MOTION to Change Venue by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18) (lak) Modified on 4/18/2019 (rwc).
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of John H. Denton re #1 MOTION Fix Venue for Claims - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (lak)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Fix Venue for Claims filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/2/2019. (lak)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Fix Venue for Claims - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Jackson
Represented By: Steven K. Kortanek
Represented By: Joseph N. Argentina, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Farnsworth
Represented By: Marcia L. Goldstein
Represented By: Ronit J. Berkovich
Represented By: Alexander Condon
Represented By: Diane P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Patrick A. Jackson
Represented By: Steven K. Kortanek
Represented By: Joseph N. Argentina, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Farnsworth
Represented By: Marcia L. Goldstein
Represented By: Ronit J. Berkovich
Represented By: Alexander Condon
Represented By: Diane P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Imerys Talc America, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanier Plaintiffs
Represented By: Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Talc Plaintiffs
Represented By: Kevin Hroblak
Represented By: Daniel A. Griffith
Represented By: Marc R. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases
Represented By: Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Represented By: Shannon M. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donna and Jerry Farra
Represented By: Rick S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?