Flexa Network Inc. v. Mandel
Petitioner: Flexa Network Inc.
Respondent: Scott Mandel
Case Number: 1:2019mc00258
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of the Memorandum Order of November 8, 2019 has been replaced with a corrected version to correct incorrect paragraph numbering. (nmf)
November 8, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #15 Memorandum Order. (nmf)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying as moot #8 MOTION for Discovery Respondent Scott J. Mandel's Motion for Limited Discovery. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/8/2019. (nmf)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #1 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/8/2019. (nmf) (Main Document 15 replaced on 11/12/2019) (nmf, ).
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Scott Mandel re #1 MOTION to Compel, #8 MOTION for Discovery Respondent Scott J. Mandel's Motion for Limited Discovery. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION for Discovery Respondent Scott J. Mandel's Motion for Limited Discovery filed by Scott Mandel. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Discovery Respondent Scott J. Mandel's Motion for Limited Discovery filed by Flexa Network Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/1/2019. (Wood, Larry)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Flexa Network Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wood, Larry)
October 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas P. Gies for Flexa Network Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas P. Gies filed by Flexa Network Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/25/2019. (fms)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas P. Gies - filed by Flexa Network Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Larry)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Discovery Respondent Scott J. Mandel's Motion for Limited Discovery filed by Scott Mandel.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/4/2019. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Discovery Respondent Scott J. Mandel's Motion for Limited Discovery - filed by Scott Mandel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Donimirski, Melissa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 Answering Brief in Opposition Petition to Compel Arbitration by Scott Mandel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-F, #3 Exhibit G-Q)(Donimirski, Melissa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Scott Mandel.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/28/2019. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski on behalf of Scott Mandel (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Taylor Hirzel, II on behalf of Scott Mandel (Hirzel, Samuel)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 Stipulation filed by Flexa Network Inc., Set Briefing Schedule: re #1 MOTION to Compel. Answering Brief due 10/21/2019., Reply Brief due 10/25/2019., Reply Brief in Further Support of any affirmative motions due by 10/29/2019. Oral Argument will be set at a later date. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/18/2019. (nmf)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing on Petition to Compel Arbitration re #2 MEMORANDUM in Support, #1 MOTION to Compel by Flexa Network Inc.. (Wood, Larry)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 16, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: deleted entry assigning case to Judge Richard G. Andrews (docketed in error) (rjb)
October 15, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (amf)
October 15, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Scott Mandel on 10/15/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
October 15, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 47, receipt number 0311-2754865. (amf)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re D.I. #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration - filed by Flexa Network Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/29/2019. (amf)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Petition to Compel Arbitration - filed by Flexa Network Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Notice of Petition, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flexa Network Inc. v. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Flexa Network Inc.
Represented By: Larry R. Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Adam V. Orlacchio
Represented By: Thomas P. Gies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Taylor Hirzel, II
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?