In re: Kerydin (Tavaborole) Topical Solution 5% Patent Litigation
Counter Claimant: Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada
Not Classified By Court: Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Mylan Inc., Perrigo Pharma International DAC, Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited, Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FlatWing Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Apotex Corp., Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Lupin Limited, Cipla USA, Inc., Encube Ethicals Pvt. Ltd., Perrigo Company plc, Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Clerk of MDL Panel, Apotex Inc., Cipla Limited and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
In Re: Kerydin (Tavaborole) Topical Solution 5% Patent Litigation
Counter Defendant: Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019md02884
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jeremy S. Cole as co-counsel. Reason for request: Leaving Firm. (Cole, Jeremy)
December 27, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Damien Nicholas Tancredi on behalf of Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc. (Tancredi, Damien)
December 16, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Paul B. Sudentas as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with Locke Lord LLP. (Kraman, Pilar)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 69 in 19-md-2884-RGA; D.I. 77 in 1:19-cv-00632-RGA) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2019 Filing 69 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Moore, David) Modified on 10/24/2019 (nms).
September 23, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove David A. Gerasimow as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with Husch Blackwell LLP. (Haney, Megan)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: The cases are ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The parties shall promptly notify the Court when the "Federal Circuit" has resolved the appeal so that these case may be reopened and other appropriate action may be taken. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO STAY: The actions are stayed pending Plaintiff's appeal of the PTAB Decisions to the Federal Circuit. The parties will notify the Court of the Federal Circuit's decision no later than three (3) days after it issues. The parties should be prepared to submit with the notification their requests for how to proceed. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
September 13, 2019 Filing 65 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Defendants' Support of Their Stay Proposal. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly)
September 13, 2019 Filing 64 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Megan E. Dellinger regarding Proposed Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Dellinger, Megan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re (71 in 19-cv-632-RGA, 129 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 86 in 18-cv-1606-RGA, 62 in 19-md-2884-RGA) Stipulation and Order to File Competing Stay Proposals. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/27/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
August 26, 2019 Filing 62 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to File Competing Stay Proposals by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Encube Ethicals Pvt. Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (128 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 85 in 18-cv-1606-RGA, 70 in 19-cv-632-RGA, 61 in 19-md-2884-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/15/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION and Order to Amend Scheduling Order by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (84 in 18-cv-1606-RGA, 59 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 127 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 68 in 19-cv-632-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/8/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
August 7, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Anjali Deshmukh as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati. (Palapura, Bindu)
August 7, 2019 Filing 59 STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order by Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (67 in 19-cv-632-RGA, 126 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 58 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 83 in 18-cv-1606-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed Protective Order to August 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
July 31, 2019 Filing 58 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Protective Order to and including August 14, 2019 - filed by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Encube Ethicals Pvt. Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (57 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 125 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 82 in 18-cv-1606-RGA, 66 in 19-cv-632-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and Order to Amend Scheduling Order by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mowery, Katharine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of core technical documents (bates numbers ASC_TAV0000001-0002838) filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rogowski, Patricia)
July 24, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Patricia Smink Rogowski. Attorney R. Touhey Myer and Salvatore Guerriero terminated. (Rogowski, Patricia)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORAL ORDER: If during the history of this case, Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) jointly wish to schedule a form of alternative dispute resolution ("ADR"), such as mediation, with Judge Burke, they should contact chambers by e-mail at Deborah_Benyo@ded.uscourts.gov or by phone. Additionally, if either side wishes to speak ex parte with Judge Burke regarding ADR matters, they may contact chambers via e-mail or by phone to arrange a time for a call. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/18/2019. (dlb)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (65 in 19-cv-632-RGA, 53 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 122 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 81 in 18-cv-1606-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a protective order to July 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
July 16, 2019 Filing 53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a protective order to July 31, 2019 - filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 7/17/2019 (nms).
June 27, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Flatwing Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Defendant Flatwing Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by FlatWing Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Phillips, John)
June 26, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel, Michelle M. Ovanesian by Perrigo Company plc, Perrigo Pharma International DAC (Higgins, James)
June 26, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Apotex's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); and (2) Apotex's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Haney, Megan)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re (119 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 64 in 19-cv632-RGA, 49 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 79 in 18-cv-1606-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and Order to Amend Scheduling Order by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (47 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 117 in 18-cv-1673-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Paragraph 3 Default Standard Disclosures and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to June 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA(nms)
June 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph M. Janusz for Apotex Corp., for Apotex Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (118 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 48 in 19-md-2884-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Janusz, filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA(nms)
June 13, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Janusz - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (78 in 18-cv-1606-RGA, 116 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 46 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 63 in 19-cv-632-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order to and including June 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
June 13, 2019 Filing 47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Paragraph 3 Default Standard Disclosures and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to June 27, 2019 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order to and including June 27, 2019 - filed by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Encube Ethicals Pvt. Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (76 in 18-cv-1606-RGA, 44 in 19-md-2884-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Paragraph 3 Default Standard Disclosures and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to June 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA(nms)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SO ORDER Granting (75 in 18-cv-1606-RGA, 43 in 19-md-2884-RGA) Stipulation of Dismissal (*Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA(nms)
June 11, 2019 Filing 44 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Paragraph 3 Default Standard Disclosures and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to June 27, 2019 - filed by FlatWing Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Haney, Megan)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal, by Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada. (Keller, Karen) Modified on 6/11/2019 (nms).
June 7, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Christine M. Braswell as Counsel by Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Kraman, Pilar)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SO ORDERED Granting (40 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 113 in 18-cv-1673-RGA) Stipulation of Dismissal (*Parties Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA(nms)
May 31, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 31, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Initial Disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) and (2) Initial Disclosures under Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc..(Cole, Jeremy)
May 31, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 29 has been replaced with an amended version. The caption on the filing has been corrected. (nms)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (72 in 18-cv-1606-RGA, 32 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 61 in 19-cv-632-RGA, 106 in 18-cv-1673-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Deadline for the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to June 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
May 30, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limiteds Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and 2) Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limiteds Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Braswell, Christine)
May 30, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Encube Ethicals Pvt. Ltd.'s: (1) Initial Disclosures Under Rule 26(a)(1) and (2) Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Encube Ethicals Pvt. Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
May 30, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. and Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Initial Disclosures Under Rule 26(a)(1) and (2) Defendants Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. and Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
May 30, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC's Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware's Default Standard for Discovery, Including Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") and 2) Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Gaza, Anne)
May 30, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Anacor's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures and (2) Anacor's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Dellinger, Megan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Perrigo Pharma International DAC and Perrigo Company plc filed by Perrigo Company plc, Perrigo Pharma International DAC.(Ovanesian, Michelle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Deadline for the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to June 13, 2019 - filed by Perrigo Company plc, Perrigo Pharma International DAC. (Ovanesian, Michelle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Aleor Dermaceuticals Limiteds Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Delawares Default Standard for Discovery and Defendant Aleor Dermaceuticals Limiteds Initial Disclosures filed by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited.(Harmon, Kate)
May 30, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) and the District of Delaware's Default Standard for Discovery filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Palapura, Bindu)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (103 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 27 in 19-md-2884-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME deadlines for Paragraph 3 Default Standard Disclosures and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to June 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-md-02884-RGA(nms)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (70 in 18-cv-1606-RGA, 26 in 19-md-2884-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:19-md-02884-RGA(nms)
May 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ascent Pharm., Inc.s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Ascent Pharm., Inc.s Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Myer, R.) (Main Document 29 replaced on 5/31/2019) (nms).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (25 in 19-md-2884-RGA, 69 in 18-cv-1606-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME extend deadlines for Paragraph 3 Default Standard Disclosures and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to June 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:19-md-02884-RGA(nms)
May 30, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Mowery, Katharine)
May 30, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME deadlines for Paragraph 3 Default Standard Disclosures and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to June 13, 2019 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time, by Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada. (Keller, Karen) Modified on 5/30/2019 (nms).
May 29, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME extend deadlines for Paragraph 3 Default Standard Disclosures and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to June 11, 2019 - filed by FlatWing Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Haney, Megan)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (102 in 18-cv-1673-RGA, 24 in 19-md-2884-RGA) STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/29/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA(nms)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 5/29/2019 (nms).
May 17, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #18 Counterclaims, by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 5/20/2019 (nms).
May 15, 2019 Filing 22 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/19 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather M. Triozzi,Telephone number 302-573-6195. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2019. (Triozzi, Heather)
May 1, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2019. Fact Discovery completed by 7/31/2020. Status Report due by 7/31/2020. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 3/12/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 4/13/2020, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/26/2021, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3-5 day Bench Trial is set to begin 4/12/2021, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
April 30, 2019 Filing 20 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Megan E. Dellinger regarding Revised Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Scheduling Order)(Dellinger, Megan)
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Contract Pharmaceuticals Limited for Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada filed by Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada. (Fry, David)
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., by Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada.(Fry, David) Modified on 4/29/2019 (nms).
April 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2019. Local counsel present for plaintiff: M. Dellinger. Local counsel present for defendants: P. Kraman, A. Gaza, K. Farnan, D. Moore, K. Mowery, N. Hoeschen, R. Touhey Myer, M. Haney, K. Harmon, K. Dorsney, S. Coyle. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(crb)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Coyle, Andrew Ryan and Nicholas Geiger, filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/24/2019. (nms)
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Coyle, Andrew Ryan and Nicholas Geiger - filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Andrew Ryan, #2 Affidavit Nicholas Geiger, #3 Affidavit Steven Coyle)(Cole, Jeremy)
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Cole on behalf of Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc. (Cole, Jeremy)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Margolis, filed by Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/24/2019. (nms)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Margolis - filed by Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary E. Hood, Mark T. Deming, Helena Berezowskyj, and John P. Snow, filed by Perrigo Pharma International DAC, Perrigo Company plc. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/24/2019. (nms)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary E. Hood, Mark T. Deming, Helena Berezowskyj, and John P. Snow - filed by Perrigo Company plc, Perrigo Pharma International DAC. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel)(Higgins, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Megan E. Dellinger regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 4/24/2019 (nms).
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine M. Braswell on behalf of Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Braswell, Christine)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bindu Ann George Palapura on behalf of Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Palapura, Bindu)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ellis Moore on behalf of Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Moore, David)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to April 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/15/2019. (nms)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to April 26, 2019 - filed by Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada. (Fry, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: September 18, 2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: August 16, 2026. (Dellinger, Megan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: See Attached. Date of Expiration of Patent: August 16, 2026. (Dellinger, Megan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: See Attached. Date of Expiration of Patent: August 16, 2026. (Dellinger, Megan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Jack B. Blumenfeld, Megan E. Dellinger and the Law Firm of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Dellinger, Megan)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is now set for 4/25/2019, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. The parties shall confer about scheduling and discovery limitations, and attempt to reach agreement. The parties shall use as a basis for discussion the Courts Rule 16 Scheduling Order patent, available on the Courts website. No later than 48 hours before the scheduling conference, the parties shall file a proposed scheduling order using the Rule 16 Scheduling Order - patent form. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:19-cv-00632-RGA(nms)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to the Clerk of USDC/WV, dated 4/4/2019, from the Clerk of USDC/DE, regarding transfer of case 18cv202-IMK. (nmg) Modified on 4/4/2019 (nms).
April 4, 2019 Remark: The following cases in the District of Delaware are included in this MDL: 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA and 1:19-cv-00632-RGA (nmg)
April 3, 2019 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA(rwc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:19-md-2884 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA(rwc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER - issued by the Panel on Multi-District Litigation on 4/3/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02884-RGA, 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Kerydin (Tavaborole) Topical Solution 5% Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Glasshouse Pharmaceuticals Limited Canada
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Timothy H. Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Myoka Kim Goodin
Represented By: Paul B. Sudentas
Represented By: Jonathan B. Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: Yan-Xin Li
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Anjali D. Deshmukh
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Kristina M. Hanson
Represented By: Tung-On Kong
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Perrigo Pharma International DAC
Represented By: Mark T. Deming
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Helena Berezowskyj
Represented By: Gary E. Hood
Represented By: Michelle M. Ovanesian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited
Represented By: Michael S. Weinstein
Represented By: Kevin M. Capuzzi
Represented By: Kate Harmon
Represented By: Manish K. Mehta
Represented By: Zaiba Baig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Represented By: Robert S. Silver
Represented By: Salvatore Guerriero
Represented By: Patricia Smink Rogowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FlatWing Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Don J. Mizerk
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: David A. Gerasimow
Represented By: Marc R. Wezowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Represented By: Aryeh N. Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Gary J. Speier
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Megan E. Hingtgen
Represented By: Samuel T. Lockner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lupin Limited
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Represented By: Aryeh N. Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Cipla USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy S. Cole
Represented By: Nicholas A. Geiger
Represented By: Andrew C. Ryan
Represented By: Steven M. Coyle
Represented By: Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Encube Ethicals Pvt. Ltd.
Represented By: Gary J. Speier
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Renee Marie Mosley
Represented By: Megan E. Hingtgen
Represented By: Samuel T. Lockner
Represented By: Renee Mosley Delcollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Perrigo Company plc
Represented By: Mark T. Deming
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Helena Berezowskyj
Represented By: Gary E. Hood
Represented By: Michelle M. Ovanesian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Myoka Kim Goodin
Represented By: Paul B. Sudentas
Represented By: Jonathan B. Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: Aaron S. Lukas
Represented By: W. Blake Coblentz
Represented By: Kerry B. McTigue
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Barry P. Golob
Represented By: Keri L. Schaubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk of MDL Panel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Cipla Limited
Represented By: Jeremy S. Cole
Represented By: Nicholas A. Geiger
Represented By: Andrew C. Ryan
Represented By: Steven M. Coyle
Represented By: Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Yan-Xin Li
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Anjali D. Deshmukh
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Kristina M. Hanson
Represented By: Tung-On Kong
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Kerydin (Tavaborole) Topical Solution 5% Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?