In re: Sensipar (Cinacalcet Hydrochloride Tablets) Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Cesar Castillo, Inc. and KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Not Classified By Court: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Actavis Pharma Inc., Cipla Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Cipla USA, Inc., Actavis plc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Clerk of MDL Panel, Actavis Inc., Amgen Inc., TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND and TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND
In Re: In re: Sensipar (Cinacalcet Hydrochloride Tablets) Antitrust Litigation
Case Number: 1:2019md02895
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Karen Lin as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Mayer Brown LLP. (Shaw, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 123 REDACTED VERSION of (71 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (86 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 62 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 42 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Redacted Document,, (52 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (32 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
February 26, 2020 Filing 122 REDACTED VERSION of (98 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Reply Brief, (51 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Reply Brief, (71 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Reply Brief by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
February 26, 2020 Filing 121 REDACTED VERSION of (53 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (61 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 84 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 41 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Redacted Document,, (73 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (33 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
February 26, 2020 Filing 120 REDACTED VERSION of (58 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 45 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 26 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Redacted Document,, (33 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (24 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (43 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
February 26, 2020 Filing 119 REDACTED VERSION of (98 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Reply Brief, (60 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Reply Brief, (94 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Reply Brief Revised Redacted Version of Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s, Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s and Actavis Pharma, Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 26, 2020 Filing 118 REDACTED VERSION of (81 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (47 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (74 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, Revised Redacted Version of Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs' Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s, Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s and Actavis Pharma, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 26, 2020 Filing 117 REDACTED VERSION of (33 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (61 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (28 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, Revised Redacted Version of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s, Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s and Actavis Pharma, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 26, 2020 Filing 116 REDACTED VERSION of (61 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Reply Brief, (99 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Reply Brief, (95 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Reply Brief Revised Redacted Version of Amgen Inc's Reply Brief in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 26, 2020 Filing 115 REDACTED VERSION of (72 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (46 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (80 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, Revised Redacted Version of Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs' Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen's Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 26, 2020 Filing 114 REDACTED VERSION of (58 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (28 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (26 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Opening Brief in Support Revised Redacted Version of Amgen's Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 19, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fourth Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Amgen Inc. (Nos. 52-56) filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE of by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., In re: Sensipar (Cinacalcet Hydrochloride Tablets) Antitrust Litigation of Withdrawal of Vera G. Belger as Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs Cesar Castillo, Inc., and KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc. and the Proposed Direct Purchaser Class (Belger, Vera)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following motions to dismiss are referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall: D.I. 25, 27, 30, 31, and 34 in 19md2895; D.I. 238, 240 in 19cv44; D.I. 39, 42 in 19cv369; D.I. 57, 60 in 19cv396; D.I. 24, 27 in 19cv1460; and D.I. 21, 23 in 19cv1461. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS et al. (ntl)
January 30, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jessica R. MacAuley for Cesar Castillo, and KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (102 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 110 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 68 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica R. MacAuley filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/30/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-md-02895-LPS (ntl)
January 29, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica R. MacAuley - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (256 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 104 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by Amgen Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/23/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00044-LPS (ntl)
January 22, 2020 Filing 109 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re (23 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (31 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (238 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (60 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (25 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, (27 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (42 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Keller, Karen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 108 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Amgen Inc. re (30 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (27 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (34 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Egan, Brian)
January 17, 2020 Filing 107 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ian Connor Bifferato and Tiffany J. regarding requesting oral argument - re (23 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (27 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (31 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (42 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Bifferato, Ian)
January 17, 2020 Filing 106 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ian Connor Bifferato and Tiffany J. Cramer regarding Requesting Oral Argument - re (57 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (27 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (31 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (60 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (24 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (27 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Cramer, Tiffany)
January 17, 2020 Filing 105 REDACTED VERSION of (61 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Reply Brief, (99 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Reply Brief, (95 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Reply Brief by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
January 17, 2020 Filing 104 PROPOSED ORDER /[Proposed] Amended Stipulated Protective Order by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re (59 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS)(50 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) (93 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS)(70 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS)(97 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Seal Document: Reply Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/15/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
January 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah E. DeLoach for KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (62 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 96 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 102 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah E. DeLoach filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/15/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS (ntl)
January 14, 2020 Filing 102 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah E. DeLoach - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
January 10, 2020 Filing 101 REPLY BRIEF re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
January 10, 2020 Filing 100 REPLY BRIEF re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
January 10, 2020 Filing 99 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
January 10, 2020 Filing 98 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
January 10, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION to Seal Document: Reply Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss - filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
January 10, 2020 Filing 96 REPLY BRIEF re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund re (53 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (55 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (32 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (33 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (71 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (76 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (73 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (52 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (35 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 30, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. re (72 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (81 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (46 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (80 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (47 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (74 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cramer, Tiffany)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (48 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS, 68 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 91 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 57 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 93 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley E. Johnson and Eric J. Stock filed by Amgen Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
December 19, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley E. Johnson and Eric J. Stock - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
December 17, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.s Disclosures under Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
December 16, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to District of Delaware Default Standard Paragraph 3 filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
December 16, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Cesar Castillo, Inc.'s and KPH Healthcare Services Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware Default Standard filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
December 16, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re (34 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS, 54 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 75 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Seal End Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to File Their Brief in Opposition to Amgen's Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint Under Seal filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re (69 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 79 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 45 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Seal filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
December 13, 2019 Filing 86 REDACTED VERSION of (71 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (52 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (32 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen Inc.s Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 85 REDACTED VERSION of #74 Answering Brief in Opposition,, to Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s, Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s and Actavis Pharma, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cramer, Tiffany)
December 13, 2019 Filing 84 REDACTED VERSION of (53 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (73 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (33 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.s, Watson Laboratories, Inc.s and Actavis Pharma, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 83 REDACTED VERSION of (76 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (55 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (35 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, End Payor Plaintiffs Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen Inc.s Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 82 REDACTED VERSION of #72 Answering Brief in Opposition,, to Defendant Amgen Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cramer, Tiffany)
December 12, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
December 10, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
December 9, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A) filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
December 9, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
December 9, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Cesar Castillo, Inc. and KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
December 6, 2019 Filing 76 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #75 MOTION to Seal End Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to File Their Brief in Opposition to Amgen's Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint Under Seal, #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim End Payor Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Seal End Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to File Their Brief in Opposition to Amgen's Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint Under Seal - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 74 [SEALED] Joint ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s, Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s and Actavis Pharma, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cramer, Tiffany)
December 6, 2019 Filing 73 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchased Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Seal, #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs' Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s, Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s, and Actavis Pharma, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 72 [SEALED] Joint ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cramer, Tiffany)
December 6, 2019 Filing 71 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchased Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Seal, #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs' Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchased Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Seal - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Seal - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cramer, Tiffany)
December 6, 2019 Filing 68 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Cipla's Supplemental Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
November 22, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove M. Sean Royall as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Egan, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Amgen filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
November 12, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of a Subpoena to Produce Documents filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
November 1, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Cipla Ltd. and Cipla USA, Inc.'s Objections to Subpoena from Plaintiffs filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re (25 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 38 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 29 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 20 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS, 59 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION to File Brief Under Seal filed by Actavis Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/24/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (43 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 247 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (i) for Plaintiffs Cipla Ltd. and Cipla USA Inc. to file their responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and (ii) Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Amgen Inc. to file their Respective Replies to (i) 12/6/19 and (ii) 1/10/20 filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/23/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-md-02895-LPS (ntl)
October 22, 2019 Filing 58 REDACTED VERSION of (33 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (24 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (61 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (28 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (43 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Ajanta Pharma USA Inc. filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Mylan Inc. filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Strides Pharma Inc. filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Piramal Healthcare UK Limited filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Alkem Laboratories Ltd. filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Amgen filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Teva Defendants filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Amgen filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Filing 45 REDACTED VERSION of (22 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (40 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (32 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, of Its Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
October 22, 2019 Filing 44 REDACTED VERSION of (58 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (28 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (26 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Opening Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
October 21, 2019 Filing 43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (i) for Plaintiffs Cipla Ltd. and Cipla USA Inc. to file their responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and (ii) Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Amgen Inc. to file their Respective Replies to (i) 12/6/2019 and (ii) 1/10/2020 - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 42 REDACTED VERSION of (243 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 37 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION Redact Opening Brief Under Seal re (26 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (239 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
October 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William R. Olson for KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS(kmd)
October 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Michael L. Roberts, Stephanie E. Smith, Debra G. Josephson, William E. Olson for KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS(kmd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bifferato, Ian)
October 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel N. Gallucci,Michael S. Tarringer for Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
October 17, 2019 Filing 40 REDACTED VERSION of (36 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 242 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS) MOTION to Redact Its Brief in Support of Its Partial Motion to Dismiss Cipla Ltd. and Cipla USA Inc.'s First Amended Complaint (D.I. 241, C.A. No. 19-44; D.I. 35, C.A. No. 19-md-2895) by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (23 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 56 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 24 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Tarringer filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS(etg)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (55 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 22 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 23 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel N. Gallucci filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS(etg)
October 17, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.s Responses and Objections to Cipla Ltd. and Cipla USA, Inc.s Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
October 17, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Amended Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Defendant Amgen filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
October 16, 2019 Filing 37 [SEALED] MOTION Redact Opening Brief Under Seal re (26 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (239 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
October 16, 2019 Filing 36 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact Its Brief in Support of Its Partial Motion to Dismiss Cipla Ltd. and Cipla USA Inc.'s First Amended Complaint (D.I. 241, C.A. No. 19-44; D.I. 35, C.A. No. 19-md-2895) - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Egan, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 35 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amgen Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/29/2019. (Egan, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 33 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/29/2019. (Keller, Karen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 32 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amgen Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/29/2019. (Egan, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss - filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 28 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amgen Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/29/2019. (Egan, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 26 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/29/2019. (Keller, Karen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Tarringer - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel N. Gallucci - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Cipla Ltd. and Cipla USA, Inc.'s Third Request for Production of Documents and Things filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (21 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 54 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 21 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. Roberts filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS(etg)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (53 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 20 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 20 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Debra Josephson filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS(etg)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (52 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 19 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 19 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephanie E. Smith filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS(etg)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (18 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 18 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 51 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Olson filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS(etg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. Roberts - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Debra Josephson - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephanie E. Smith - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Olson - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 REDACTED VERSION of (13 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 48 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 15 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Amended Complaint, Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 REDACTED VERSION of (35 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 12 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 17 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Amended Complaint,, by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re (10 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 14 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 47 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to File Consolidated Complaint Under Seal filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS (ntl)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re (16 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS, 34 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 11 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 [SEALED] AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Actavis Pharma Inc., Amgen Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.- filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cramer, Tiffany)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 [SEALED] AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Amgen Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.- filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to File Consolidated Complaint Under Seal - filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cramer, Tiffany)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Joanne Cramer on behalf of KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. (Cramer, Tiffany)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 11 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 45 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 32 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 14 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) STIPULATION and Order Regarding the Filing of Consolidated Pleading and Responses to Consolidated Pleading. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/29/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 231 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS) STIPULATION and Order Regarding Filing of Responses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Amgen Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/27/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-md-02895-LPS (ntl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding the Filing of Consolidated Pleading and Responses to Consolidated Pleading by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Filing of Responses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint re (215 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS) Stipulation -- by Amgen Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall provide the Court with a joint status report on or before August 26, 2019. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/12/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS et al. (ntl)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Clerk, USDC/NJ from Clerk,USDC/DE, dated 7/31/19, regarding transfer of Civil Action to Delaware. (rwc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Clerk, USDC/EDPA from Clerk,USDC/DE, dated 7/31/19, regarding transfer of Civil Action to Delaware. (rwc)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS(rwc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:19-md-2895 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS(rwc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER - issued by the Panel on Multi-District Litigation on 7/31/19 - Associated DE Cases: CA 19-44-LPS, CA 19-369-LPS, CA 19-396-LPS. (rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Sensipar (Cinacalcet Hydrochloride Tablets) Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Gregory Asciolla
Represented By: Robin A. van der Meulen
Represented By: Brent Landau
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Istvan
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Adam J. Pessin
Represented By: Ned C. Weinberger
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg
Represented By: Matthew J. Perez
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: Irving Scher
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Paul Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Henninger S. Bullock
Represented By: MELANIE L. KATSUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Cipla Ltd.
Represented By: Deanne K. Cevasco
Represented By: Sue L. Robinson
Represented By: James W. Dabney
Represented By: Lynn M. Russo
Represented By: David E. Lansky
Represented By: Dina R. Hoffer
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Patrice P. Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Richard A. Spehr
Represented By: Henninger S. Bullock
Represented By: MELANIE L. KATSUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Cipla USA, Inc.
Represented By: Deanne K. Cevasco
Represented By: Sue L. Robinson
Represented By: James W. Dabney
Represented By: Lynn M. Russo
Represented By: David E. Lansky
Represented By: Dina R. Hoffer
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Patrice P. Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Actavis plc
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: MELANIE L. KATSUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Henninger S. Bullock
Represented By: MELANIE L. KATSUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Henninger S. Bullock
Represented By: MELANIE L. KATSUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk of MDL Panel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Ashley E. Johnson
Represented By: Eric J. Stock
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: MELANIE L. KATSUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Represented By: Lee Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Represented By: Lee Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Castillo, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: Daniel N. Gallucci
Represented By: Michael S. Tarringer
Represented By: Jessica R. MacAuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: Michael L. Roberts
Represented By: Stephanie E. Smith
Represented By: Daniel N. Gallucci
Represented By: William R. Olson
Represented By: Michael S. Tarringer
Represented By: Debra G. Josephson
Represented By: Jessica R. MacAuley
Represented By: Sarah E. DeLoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: Sensipar (Cinacalcet Hydrochloride Tablets) Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?