In re: Auryxia (Ferric Citrate) Patent Litigation
Not Classified By Court: Chemo Research S.L., Insud Pharma S.L., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Clerk of MDL Panel, Insud Pharma S.L.U. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Counter Defendant: Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc. and Chen Hsing Hsu
Counter Claimant: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA and Lupin Ltd.
In Re: In re: Auryxia (Ferric Citrate) Patent Litigation
Case Number: 1:2019md02896
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (80 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 58 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert E. Niemeier filed by Insud Pharma S.L.U., Chemo Research S.L. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/24/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 1:19-md-02896-LPS (ntl)
February 21, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
February 21, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert E. Niemeier - filed by Chemo Research S.L., Insud Pharma S.L.U.. (Wilson, Samantha)
February 18, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 10) filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
February 10, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (57 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 58 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 54 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 75 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 57 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 51 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS, 76 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS) Stipulation and Order filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu, Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/4/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
February 5, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Chemo Research S.L., Insud Pharma S.L..(Wilson, Samantha)
February 3, 2020 Filing 76 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re: technology tutorial by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu. (Raucci, Anthony)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (50 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS, 56 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 56 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 57 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 75 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 53 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 74 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gillian T. Farrell and Jonathan A. Cox filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu, Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/28/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
January 27, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gillian T. Farrell and Jonathan A. Cox - filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu. (Raucci, Anthony)
January 24, 2020 Filing 74 CLAIM Construction Chart by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, Volume 1, #2 Exhibit C, Volume 2, #3 Exhibit C, Volume 3)(Raucci, Anthony)
January 10, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Identification of Proposed Constructions for Terms Identified by Defendants as In Need of Construction filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
January 10, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Proposed Constructions of Identified Claim Terms filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Ltd..(Bilson, David)
January 10, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 10) to Plaintiffs filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Ltd..(Bilson, David)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SO ORDERED, re (52 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 52 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 69 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 53 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 46 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS, 49 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 70 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME various deadlines to various dates -- Joint Claim Construction Brief due 3/27/20. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
December 18, 2019 Filing 69 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME various deadlines to various dates - filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu. (Raucci, Anthony)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (68 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 52 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 51 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 48 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 45 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS, 51 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 69 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS) ADDENDUM TO PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
December 13, 2019 Filing 68 PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Addendum to Pretrial Scheduling Order re (26 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS, 30 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 51 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 32 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 34 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 32 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 29 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS) Scheduling Order,, by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu. (Raucci, Anthony)
December 12, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Identification of Claim Terms for Construction filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s Supplemental Identification of Claim Terms for Construction filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Identification of Terms/Phrases for Construction filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
December 11, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Joshua I. Miller as co-counsel.. (Wilson, Samantha)
December 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Conly S. Wythers for Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA and Lupin Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 1:19-md-02896-LPS(kmd)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (49 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 62 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Conly S. Wythers filed by Lupin Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/11/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:19-cv-00884-LPS (ntl)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (63 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 48 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Conly S. Wythers filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/11/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:18-cv-01968-LPS (ntl)
December 9, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Conly S. Wythers - filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Conly S. Wythers)(Bilson, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Conly S. Wythers - filed by Lupin Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Conly S. Wythers)(Bilson, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher B. Roberts as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer Affiliated with the case. (Bilson, David)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (59 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 65 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 48 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 46 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 47 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 44 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 41 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties' to submit an addendum to the Scheduling Order regarding the locations and limits of depositions to December 13, 2019 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/25/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
November 25, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey E. Timlin on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Timlin, Tracey)
November 22, 2019 Filing 59 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties' to submit an addendum to the Scheduling Order regarding the locations and limits of depositions to December 13, 2019 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu)
November 21, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' [CONFIDENTIAL] Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Ltd..(Bilson, David)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (45 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 39 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 57 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 63 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 46 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 44 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various Deadlines to Various Dates -- Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 3/11/2020. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 2/12/2020. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/8/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
November 6, 2019 Filing 57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various Deadlines to Various Dates - filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Ltd.. (Bilson, David)
October 29, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Deric X. Geng, Ph.D. for Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., and Chen Hsing Hsu added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00885-LPS et al.(amf)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (61 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 55 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 43 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 42 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 40 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 44 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 37 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/28/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
October 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Katherine P. Kieckhafer for Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al.(kmd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 1-9); and (2) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Request for Production (Nos. 2-108) filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
October 16, 2019 Filing 55 PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Protective Order by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu. (Raucci, Anthony)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (60 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 43 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 54 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 36 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS, 39 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 41 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a protective order in this action to October 16, 2019 filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu, Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/15/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (47 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 41 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 40 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 40 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 33 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS, 58 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 37 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine P. Kieckhafer, Colleen McCullough and Deric X. Geng filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu, Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/15/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
October 11, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a protective order in this action to October 16, 2019 - filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu. (Raucci, Anthony)
October 11, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
October 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher B. Roberts for Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA and Lupin Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher B. Roberts filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/2019. (etg)
October 9, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher B. Roberts - filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher B. Roberts)(Bilson, David)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #48 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Protective Order to October 11, 2019 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/8/2019. (etg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Chemo Research S.L. and Insud Pharma S.L.U.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Chemo Research S.L., Insud Pharma S.L.U..(Wilson, Samantha)
October 8, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) [Confidential-Pursuant to D. Del. LR 26.2] filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Palapura, Bindu)
October 7, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA's and Lupin Limited's [CONFIDENTIAL - SUBJECT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER] Objections and Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA.(Bilson, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Protective Order to October 11, 2019 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (46 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 57 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 39 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 39 in 1:19-cv-00884-LPS, 40 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 36 in 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 32 in 1:19-cv-00885-LPS) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a Protective Order to October 4, 2019 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine P. Kieckhafer, Colleen McCullough and Deric X. Geng - filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu. (Raucci, Anthony)
September 30, 2019 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a Protective Order to October 4, 2019 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu)
September 30, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to #25 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, [Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Counterclaims] by Chen Hsing Hsu, Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc..(Raucci, Anthony)
September 30, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to #25 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, [Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Counterclaims] by Chen Hsing Hsu, Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc..(Raucci, Anthony)
September 30, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.s and Watson Laboratories, Inc.s Initial Disclosures 2. Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.s and Watson Laboratories, Inc.s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants Chemo Research S.L. and Insud Pharma S.L.U.'s Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures, and 2) Defendants' Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Chemo Research S.L., Insud Pharma S.L.U..(Wilson, Samantha)
September 27, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Rule 26(a)(1) And The District Of Delaware's Default Standard For Discovery filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Palapura, Bindu)
September 27, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lupin Limited's [CONFIDENTIAL] Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures and Lupin Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Initial Disclosures Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Material (ESI) filed by Lupin Ltd..(Bilson, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lupin Limited and Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA's [CONFIDENTIAL] Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Lupin Ltd.'s and Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA's [CONFIDENTIAL] Initial Disclosures Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Materials (ESI) filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Ltd..(Bilson, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (2) Plaintiffs' Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
September 23, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Infringement Contentions for the Teva II Action filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc..(Raucci, Anthony)
September 23, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Infringement Contentions for the Teva I Action filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc..(Raucci, Anthony)
September 23, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Infringement Contentions for the Mylan Action filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc..(Raucci, Anthony)
September 23, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Infringement Contentions for the Lupin II Action filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc..(Raucci, Anthony)
September 23, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Infringement Contentions for the Lupin I Action filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc..(Raucci, Anthony)
September 23, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Infringement Contentions for the Chemo Action filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc..(Raucci, Anthony)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORAL ORDER: If, during the pendency of this case, Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) jointly wish to schedule a form of alternative dispute resolution ("ADR"), such as mediation, with Judge Hall, they should contact chambers by e-mail at Cailah_Garfinkel@ded.uscourts.gov or by phone. Additionally, if either side wishes to speak ex parte with Judge Hall regarding ADR matters, they may contact chambers via e-mail or by phone to arrange a time for a call. In addition, Judge Hall may in the future enter a sua sponte order setting an ADR teleconference. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 9/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al.(ceg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 2-108) to Plaintiffs; and 2) Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-9) to Plaintiffs filed by Chemo Research S.L., Insud Pharma S.L.U..(Wilson, Samantha)
September 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al.(cak)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 12/11/2020. Status Report due by 7/3/2020. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 1/31/2020. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 2/28/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 4/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/19/2021. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. An 8-day Bench Trial is set for 2/8/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/19/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS et al. (ntl)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Request for Production (No. 1) filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SO ORDERED, re #26 STIPULATION AND CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/12/19. (ntl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Consolidation Order by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu. (Raucci, Anthony)
September 9, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Chen Hsing Hsu, Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc. by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA.(Phillips, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER: Regarding the two tag-along actions (Civil Action Nos. 19-884 & 19-885), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer and by September 11 submit a proposed form of order that would add those two cases to the MDL. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/6/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 1:19-cv-01445-LPS (ntl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mylan's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production (Nos. 1-33) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Palapura, Bindu)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Chemo Research S.L. and Insud Pharma S.L.U's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things filed by Chemo Research S.L., Insud Pharma S.L.U..(Gaza, Anne)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA's and Lupin Limited's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-33) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA.(Bilson, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Pretrial Order --[Proposed] Pretrial Scheduling Order-- by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Raucci, Anthony)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu. (Raucci, Anthony)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Ltd.- filed by Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O)(Raucci, Anthony)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (23 in 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 14 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS) Stipulation and Order re Amended Complaint filed by Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu, Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/26/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:18-cv-01968-LPS (ntl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 4a of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu, Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to file the Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit 1 by Chen Hsing Hsu, Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A-O, #3 Exhibit 2)(Raucci, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding plaintiffs request to add C.A. Nos. 19-884 and 19-885 to MDL action. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (27 in 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 12 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Giancarlo Scaccia and Elana Araj filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/19/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:18-cv-02012-LPS (ntl)
August 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dennies Varughese for Chemo Research S.L., Insud Pharma S.L.U. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 1:19-md-02896-LPS(kmd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Giancarlo Scaccia and Elana Araj - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
August 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Charles T. Wysocki and Adam C. LaRock for Chemo Research S.L. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Request for Production (No. 1) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Ltd., Chemo Research S.L., Insud Pharma S.L.U..(Palapura, Bindu)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall provide the Court with a joint status report on or before August 26, 2019. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/12/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 1:19-cv-00220-LPS, 1:19-cv-01445-LPS (ntl)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (41 in 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 9 in 1:19-md-02896-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yan-Xin Li of Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/9/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:19-cv-01445-LPS (ntl)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yan-Xin Li of Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Anjali Deshmukh as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati. (Moore, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ellis Moore on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Moore, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bindu Ann George Palapura on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Palapura, Bindu)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc., Chen Hsing Hsu.(Raucci, Anthony)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 1:19-md-02896-LPS(rwc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:19-md-2896 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01445-LPS, 1:19-md-02896-LPS(rwc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to USDC/NDWV from Clerk, USDC/DE, dated 7/31/19, regarding Request for case to be transferred to Delaware. (rwc)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 1:19-cv-00220-LPS(rwc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:19-md-2896 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 1:19-cv-00220-LPS(rwc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER - issued by the Panel on Multi-District Litigation on 7/31/19 - Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02896-LPS, 1:18-cv-01968-LPS, 1:18-cv-02012-LPS, 1:19-cv-00220-LPS(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Auryxia (Ferric Citrate) Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Chemo Research S.L.
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Charles T. Wysocki
Represented By: Dennies Varughese
Represented By: Adam C. LaRock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Insud Pharma S.L.
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: David M. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk of MDL Panel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Insud Pharma S.L.U.
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Anjali D. Deshmukh
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: Dennis Gregory
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Tung-On Kong
Represented By: Tracey E. Timlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Cook
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Emily R. Whelan
Represented By: Anthony David Raucci
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Represented By: Lisa J. Pirozzolo
Represented By: Gordon Lee Mowen, II
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Represented By: Katherine P. Kieckhafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Panion & BF Biotech, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Cook
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Emily R. Whelan
Represented By: Anthony David Raucci
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Represented By: Lisa J. Pirozzolo
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Represented By: Katherine P. Kieckhafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Chen Hsing Hsu
Represented By: Timothy A. Cook
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Emily R. Whelan
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Represented By: Lisa J. Pirozzolo
Represented By: Anthony David Raucci
Represented By: Gordon Lee Mowen, II
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Represented By: Katherine P. Kieckhafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tara M. Raghavan
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Christopher B. Roberts
Represented By: Conly S. Wythers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lupin Ltd.
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tara M. Raghavan
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Christopher B. Roberts
Represented By: Conly S. Wythers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: Auryxia (Ferric Citrate) Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?