In re: Sitagliptin Phosphate ('708 & '921) Patent Litigation
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Macleods Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alvogen Pine Brook LLC, Wockhardt USA LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Clerk of MDL Panel, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Apotex Corp., Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Wockhardt Bio AG, Lupin Limited, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Alvogen Malta Operations Ltd., Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Apotex Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
In Re: In re: Sitagliptin Phosphate ('708 & '921) Patent Litigation
Case Number: 1:2019md02902
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (52 in 19-cv-318-RGA; 53 in 19-md-2902-RGA; 51 in 19-cv-317-RGA; 46 in 19-cv-312-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shaobo Zhu and Sarah J. Fischer, filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Sandoz Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/10/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00312-RGA, 1:19-cv-00317-RGA, 1:19-cv-00318-RGA, 1:19-md-02902-RGA(nms)
February 10, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shaobo Zhu and Sarah J. Fischer - filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (D.I. 20 in 19-cv-2192-RGA; D.I. 52 in 19-md-2902-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA, 1:19-cv-02192-RGA(nms)
February 6, 2020 Filing 52 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Amend Scheduling Order by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Seaman, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (ii) Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc..(Seaman, John)
January 31, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Initial Infringement Contentions of Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Silver, Daniel)
January 31, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Silver, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (44 in 19-cv-311-RGA; 51 in 19-cv-318-RGA; 45 in 19-cv-312-RGA, 43 in 19-cv-320-RGA; 44 in 19-cv-314-RGA; 44 in 19-cv-316-RGA: 50 in 19-cv-317-RGA, 50 in 19-cv-313-RGA; 46 in 19-cv-319-RGA; 47 in 19-cv-872-RGA; 43 in 19-cv-321-RGA, 48 in 19-md-2902-RGA; 48 in 19-cv-347-RGA; 74 in 19-cv-1489-RGA; 48 in 19-cv-310-RGA) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-RGA et al.(nms)
January 30, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order - filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Sandoz Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 1/30/2020 (nms).
January 24, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Claim Terms for Construction and Proposed Constructions filed by Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Mowery, Katharine)
January 24, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.s Claim Construction Issue Identification filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Silver, Daniel)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORAL ORDER re (42 in 1:19-md-02902-RGA) Order Setting Teleconference: The Telephone Conference with Judge Thynge scheduled for 11/18/2019 at 4:00 PM Eastern Time is cancelled. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/18/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00872-RGA, 1:19-md-02902-RGA(cak)
November 14, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.s Responses and Objections to Defendants First Set of Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-107) filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Silver, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Mowery, Katharine)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 11/18/2019 at 4:00 PM Eastern Time with Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Counsel for Merck shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/24/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00872-RGA, 1:19-md-02902-RGA(cak)
October 21, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.s Responses and Objections to Defendants Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s First Set of Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2) filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Silver, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.s Responses and Objections to Defendants First Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Silver, Daniel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production and 2) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd..(Wilson, Samantha)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (68 in 19-cv-1489-RGA, 38 in 19-md-2902-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Mylan to serve initial invalidity contentions to October 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA, 1:19-cv-01489-RGA(nms)
October 9, 2019 Filing 38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Mylan to serve initial invalidity contentions to October 25, 2019 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-107) filed by Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Mowery, Katharine)
October 1, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Alvogen Pine Brook LLC and Alvogen Malta Operations Ltd.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) and (2) Defendants Alvogen Pine Brook LLC and Alvogen Malta Operations Ltd.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-78) filed by Alvogen Malta Operations Ltd., Alvogen Pine Brook LLC.(Farnan, Kelly)
September 30, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) and Sandoz Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-78) filed by In re: Sitagliptin Phosphate ('708 & '921) Patent Litigation, Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 30, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Watson Laboratories, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6), and Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-84) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., In re: Sitagliptin Phosphate ('708 & '921) Patent Litigation.(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 30, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) and Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-78) filed by In re: Sitagliptin Phosphate ('708 & '921) Patent Litigation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-78) filed by Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Mowery, Katharine)
September 30, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) and Responses and Objections to First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-78) filed by Wockhardt Bio AG, Wockhardt USA LLC.(Mosley, Renee)
September 30, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) filed by Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Mowery, Katharine)
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) responses to first set of interrogatories and (2) responses to first set of requests for production filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 30, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Defendants Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Bilson, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-10) filed by Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Mowery, Katharine)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Infringement Contentions of Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Joyce, Alexandra)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 10/24/2019 at 9:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Mary Pat Thynge, plaintiff Merck and defendant Torrent entities ONLY. Counsel for the Torrent entities shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00872-RGA, 1:19-md-02902-RGA(cak)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SO ORDERED Granting (22 in 19-md-2902-RGA; 35 in 19-cv-319-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order (*Sun Pharma Global FZE terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00319-RGA, 1:19-md-02902-RGA(nms)
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Infringement Contentions of Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Silver, Daniel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (Wilson, Samantha)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER re (33 in 1:19-cv-00872-RGA, 20 in 1:19-md-02902-RGA) Order Setting Teleconference: The teleconference scheduled for 9/16/19 at 12:00 Noon with Judge Thynge to discuss ADR is between plaintiff and defendants Torrent ONLY. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/10/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA, 1:19-cv-00872-RGA(cak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/16/2019 at 12:00 Noon Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/6/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA, 1:19-cv-00872-RGA(cak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.'s First Sets of Interrogatories and First Sets of Requests for Production to Defendants filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Silver, Daniel)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (32 in 19-cv-316-RGA, 18 in 19-md-2902-RGA, 40 in 19-cv-318-RGA, 39 in 19-cv-313-RGA, 32 in 19-cv-320-RGA, 33 in 19-cv-319-RGA, 33 in 19-cv-314-RGA, 32 in 19-cv-321-RGA, 35 in 19-cv-347-RGA, 32 in 19-cv-311-RGA, 37 in 19-cv-310-RGA, 34 in 19-cv-312-RGA, 39 in 19-cv-317-RGA, 29 in 19-cv-872-RGA) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/28/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA et al.(nms)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 8/27/2019 (nms).
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 Answer to Counterclaims of Torrent Pharmaceuticals Limited and Torrent Pharma, Inc. (see D.I. 18 in C.A. No. 19-872-RGA), by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 8/26/2019 (nms).
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mylan's Core Technical Documents filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 2/14/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/14/2020. Fact Discovery completed by 11/20/2020. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 7/17/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 8/18/2020, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA, 1:19-cv-01489-RGA(nms)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 8/22/2019 (nms).
August 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA, 1:19-cv-00872-RGA(cak)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 2/14/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/14/2020. Fact Discovery completed by 11/20/2020. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 7/17/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 8/18/2020, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/10/2021, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3 day Bench Trial is set to start 10/4/2021, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA, 1:19-cv-00872-RGA(nms)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED regarding Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA et al.(nms)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Mylan's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (2) Mylan's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Identifying Defendants Accused Products and Plaintiffs Asserted Patents; and (2) Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp..(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 8/21/2019 (nms).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (55 in 19-cv-1489-RGA, 32 in 19-cv-347-RGA, 30 in 19-cv-319-RGA, 29 in 19-cv-320-RGA, 29 in 19-cv-321-RGA, 36 in 19-cv-313-RGA, 34 in 19-cv-310-RGA, 8 in 19-md-2902-RGA, 29 in 19-cv-316-RGA, 30 in 19-cv-314-RGA, 37 in 19-cv-318-RGA, 24 in 19-cv-872-RGA, 31 in 19-cv-312-RGA, 29 in 19-cv-311-RGA, 36 in 19-cv-317-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order to August 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/15/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA et al.(nms)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order, by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 8/20/2019 (nms).
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Protective Order to August 19, 2019 - filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Silver, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 8/20/2019 (nms).
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Kelly, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Silver, Daniel)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to USDC/NDWV from Clerk, USDC/DE, dated 8/9/2019, regarding request for case to be transferred to Delaware. (amf)
August 8, 2019 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA et al.(amf)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:19-md-2902 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA et al.(amf)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER - issued by the Panel on Multi-District Litigation on 8/8/2019 - Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02902-RGA et al.(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Sitagliptin Phosphate ('708 & '921) Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Frank X. Duff
Represented By: Stanley E. Fisher
Represented By: Anthony H. Sheh
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: Jingyuan Luo
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexander S. Zolan
Represented By: Jessamyn S. Berniker
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Anthony Sheh
Represented By: Shaun P. Mahaffy
Represented By: Bruce R. Genderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron M. Nelson
Represented By: Christie Larochelle
Represented By: Keith A. Zullow
Represented By: Julius Jefferson
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Torrent Pharma Inc.
Represented By: A. Neal Seth
Represented By: Laura R. Braden
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Torrent Pharmaceuticals Limited
Represented By: A. Neal Seth
Represented By: Laura R. Braden
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David B. Abramowitz
Represented By: Carolyn A. Blessing
Represented By: Christopher J. Cassella
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Zachary B. Cohen
Represented By: Charles B. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Macleods Pharmaceuticals Limited
Represented By: A. Neal Seth
Represented By: Laura R. Braden
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Alvogen Pine Brook LLC
Represented By: Brett M. Garrison
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Matthew J. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Wockhardt USA LLC
Represented By: David H. Silverstein
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Christopher M. Gallo
Represented By: Aziz Burgy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Silverstein
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Christopher M. Gallo
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Represented By: Aziz Burgy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk of MDL Panel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jonathan E. Bachand
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Guylaine Hache, Ph.D.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Macleods Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: A. Neal Seth
Represented By: Laura R. Braden
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Wockhardt Bio AG
Represented By: David H. Silverstein
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Christopher M. Gallo
Represented By: Aziz Burgy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lupin Limited
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jonathan E. Bachand
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron M. Nelson
Represented By: Christie Larochelle
Represented By: Keith A. Zullow
Represented By: Julius Jefferson
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Alvogen Malta Operations Ltd.
Represented By: Brett M. Garrison
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Matthew J. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David B. Abramowitz
Represented By: Carolyn A. Blessing
Represented By: Christopher J. Cassella
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Silverstein
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Christopher M. Gallo
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Represented By: Aziz Burgy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Aaron M. Nelson
Represented By: Christie Larochelle
Represented By: Keith A. Zullow
Represented By: Julius Jefferson
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Zachary B. Cohen
Represented By: Charles B. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Guylaine Hache, Ph.D.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alissa M. Pacchioli
Represented By: Lance A Soderstrom
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee
Represented By: Jitendra Malik
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: Sitagliptin Phosphate ('708 & '921) Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?