In re: Palbociclib Patent Litigation
Not Yet Classified: Aizant Drug Research Solutions Pvt. Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., PF Prism C.V., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Hetero Drugs, Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd., Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Qilu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Qilu Pharma, Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Eugia Pharma Specialties Ltd., Natco Pharma, Inc., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Hetero Labs, Ltd., Pfizer Inc., Cipla USA Inc., Apotex Corp., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., PF PRISM IMB B.V., Natco Pharma, Ltd., Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD., Alembic Pharmacauticals, Ltd., Cipla Ltd., Cadila Healthcare, Ltd., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Clerk of MDL Panel, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Apotex Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
In Re: In re: Palbociclib Patent Litigation
Case Number: 1:2019md02912
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions for ANDA Products and Accompanying Production (addressed to various defendants as outlined in notice) filed by PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc..(Dellinger, Megan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 45 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Megan E. Dellinger regarding Protective Order Dispute - re (42 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC) Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Dellinger, Megan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Cipla USA Inc.'s and Cipla, Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to the Delaware Default Standard Paragraph 3 filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
November 26, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Natco Pharma Inc.'s and Natco Pharma, Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to the Delaware Default Standard Paragraph 3 filed by Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
November 25, 2019 Filing 42 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Stephen B. Brauerman regarding Protective Order Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Compliance)(Brauerman, Stephen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-50) and (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4) filed by PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Dellinger, Megan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Qilu Pharma, Inc., Qilu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 21, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Cadila Healthcare, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC.(Haney, Megan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alembic Defendants' Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding Discovery filed by Alembic Pharmacauticals, Ltd., Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Palapura, Bindu)
November 21, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Dellinger, Megan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
November 21, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 20, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aizant Drug Research Solutions Pvt. Ltd.s Initial ESI Disclosures and Aizant Drug Research Solutions Pvt. Ltd.s Initial ESI Disclosures filed by Aizant Drug Research Solutions Pvt. Ltd..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Auten, Ian Scott and Richard T. Ruzich filed by Qilu Pharma, Inc., Qilu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/18/2019. (fms)
November 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Megan E. Hingtgen for Sun Pharma Global FZE,for Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., for Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (32 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 48 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Hingtgen filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Sun Pharma Global FZE. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC(fms)
November 13, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Hingtgen - filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
November 7, 2019 Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set per request of counsel for 12/3/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(nmf)
November 7, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Auten, Ian Scott and Richard T. Ruzich - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Qilu Pharma, Inc., Qilu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (46 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 61 in 1:19-cv-01863-CFC, 30 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to November 4, 2019 filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(fms)
October 31, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to November 4, 2019 - filed by PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Dellinger, Megan)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (29 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 60 in 1:19-cv-01863-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jitendra Malik, Ph.D. of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(fms)
October 30, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jitendra Malik, Ph.D. of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Moore, David)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. All times are Eastern. See Order for details. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/22/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/22/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/22/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/22/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/22/2020 at 12:30 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/22/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/23/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/23/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/23/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge A Telephone Conference is set for 6/23/2020 at 12:30 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/29/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(cak)
October 28, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Cadila Healthcare, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC.(Haney, Megan)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (43 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 26 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Sorenson, Karen L. Beckman and Andrew O. Larsen filed by Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd., (41 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 24 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Sorenson, Karen L. Beckman and Andrew O. Larsen filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/28/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC(fms)
October 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Sorenson, Karen L. Beckman and Andrew O. Larsen - filed by Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Natco Pharma Inc.s and Natco Pharma, Ltd.s Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Sorenson, Karen L. Beckman and Andrew O. Larsen - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Cipla USA Inc.s and Cipla, Ltd.s Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
October 28, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Service filed by Cipla USA Inc. and Cipla Ltd. at D.I. No. #20 in 19-cv-749-CFC and at D.I. #23 in 19-md-2912-CFC has been removed from the dockets to be corrected and refiled in the correct civil action shortly. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00749-CFC(fms)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.s Initial Disclosures filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (38 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 21 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 58 in 1:19-cv-01863-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Proposed Protective Order to through and including October 31, 2019 filed by Natco Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Cipla Ltd., Natco Pharma, Ltd., Cipla USA Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(fms)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Proposed Protective Order to through and including October 31, 2019 - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA Inc., Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures and Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Hetero Drugs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/22/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(cak)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (18 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 35 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to October 25, 2019 filed by Hetero Labs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Drugs, Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/22/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-md-02912-CFC(fms)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (17 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 34 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Zydus to serve its Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to October 28, 2019 filed by Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Cadila Healthcare, Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/22/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC(fms)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (30 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 13 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to October 25, 2019 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/22/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC(fms)
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to October 25, 2019 - filed by Hetero Drugs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Zydus to serve its Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to October 28, 2019 - filed by Cadila Healthcare, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC. (Haney, Megan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd., Eugia Pharma Specialties Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc..(Dellinger, Megan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Sun Pharma Global FZE, and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.s Initial Disclosures Under Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to October 25, 2019 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alembic Defendants' Initial Disclosures filed by Alembic Pharmacauticals, Ltd., Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Timlin, Tracey)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Apotex's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (2) Qilu's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Qilu Pharma, Inc., Qilu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(cak)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2020. Discovery due by 12/4/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 7/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Bench Trial is set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/15/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(nmf)
October 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(nmf)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re (53 in 1:19-cv-01863-CFC, 8 in 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 25 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC) Proposed Order, As the parties' only remaining disagreement is regarding time limits for depositions, the In-Person Scheduling Conference is rescheduled as a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 10/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Counsel for plaintiffs shall coordinate and initiate the call to chambers. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-01863-CFC(nmf)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Scheduling Order re (19 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC) Order Setting Scheduling Conference by PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter to Judge Connolly from Megan Dellinger)(Dellinger, Megan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer, Inc. for PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC filed by PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Dellinger, Megan)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED, re #5 Stipulation and Order to Add Plaintiff and Amend Caption filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/10/2019. (fms)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Add Plaintiff and Amend Caption by PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Elizabeth Dellinger on behalf of PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc. (Dellinger, Megan)
October 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Michael J. Gaertner, James T. Peterka, Andy J. Miller, Jennifer M. Coronel, Zhibin Li for Cadila Healthcare, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:19-cv-00760-CFC(kmd)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, James T. Peterka, Andy Miller, Jennifer M. Coronel and Zhibin Li filed by Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Cadila Healthcare, Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/4/2019. (fms)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, James T. Peterka, Andy Miller, Jennifer M. Coronel and Zhibin Li - filed by Cadila Healthcare, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael J. Gaertner, #2 Certification of James Peterka, #3 Certification of Andy Miller, #4 Certification of Jennifer M. Coronel, #5 Certification of Zhibin Li)(Haney, Megan)
October 2, 2019 Remark : The following cases in the District of Delaware are included in this MDL 19-2912: CA 19-743, CA 19-745, CA 19-747, CA 19-748, CA 19-749, CA 19-750, CA 19-751, CA 19-753, CA 19-754, CA 19-758, CA 19-759, CA 19-760. (rwc)
October 2, 2019 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC et al.(rwc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:19-md-2912 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Colm F. Connolly. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC et al.(rwc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER - signed 10/2/19 by Clerk, MDL panel. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC et al.(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Palbociclib Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Aizant Drug Research Solutions Pvt. Ltd.
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Hetero USA Inc.
Represented By: Dmitry Shelhoff
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PF Prism C.V.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Christopher J. Mandernach
Represented By: Michael Xun Liu
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: David I. Berl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Zhibin Li
Represented By: Jennifer M. Coronel
Represented By: Andy J. Miller
Represented By: James T. Peterka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Hetero Drugs, Ltd.
Represented By: Dmitry Shelhoff
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Joel M. Wallace
Represented By: Chad F. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Christopher J. Mandernach
Represented By: Michael Xun Liu
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: David I. Berl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Qilu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Gary J. Speier
Represented By: Caroline L. Marsili
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Samuel T. Lockner
Represented By: Megan E. Hingtgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Qilu Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Zydus Worldwide DMCC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Zhibin Li
Represented By: Jennifer M. Coronel
Represented By: Andy J. Miller
Represented By: James T. Peterka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Eugia Pharma Specialties Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Joel M. Wallace
Represented By: Chad F. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Natco Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V
Represented By: Dmitry Shelhoff
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Joshua S. Weinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Hetero Labs, Ltd.
Represented By: Dmitry Shelhoff
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Seth R. Bowers
Represented By: Christopher J. Mandernach
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Kathryn Kayali
Represented By: Michael Xun Liu
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: David I. Berl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Cipla USA Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Joshua S. Weinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PF PRISM IMB B.V.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Natco Pharma, Ltd.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Joel M. Wallace
Represented By: Chad F. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alembic Pharmacauticals, Ltd.
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Cipla Ltd.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Cadila Healthcare, Ltd.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Zhibin Li
Represented By: Jennifer M. Coronel
Represented By: Andy J. Miller
Represented By: James T. Peterka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Gary J. Speier
Represented By: Caroline L. Marsili
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Samuel T. Lockner
Represented By: Megan E. Hingtgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Christopher J. Mandernach
Represented By: Michael Xun Liu
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: David I. Berl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Represented By: Gary J. Speier
Represented By: Caroline L. Marsili
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Samuel T. Lockner
Represented By: Megan E. Hingtgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Clerk of MDL Panel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Christopher J. Mandernach
Represented By: Michael Xun Liu
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: David I. Berl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Guylaine Hache
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: Lance A Soderstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: Palbociclib Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?