Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP et al v. Boyer et al
Plaintiff: OPPORTUNITY FUND (CAYMAN), LP and ORBIS OPPORTUNITY FUND, LP
Defendant: David Alan Boyer, Does 1 through 50 inclusive, Paul Michael Pickett, Odyssey Engines, LLC, SAVANNA LEASING LLC and Joel Plasco
Case Number: 1:2020cv00040
Filed: January 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 32 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/12/2020. (sam)
January 13, 2020 Filing 31 Record of case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-24689. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #24 Motion to Dismiss. Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by David Alan Boyer, Odyssey Engines, LLC, Paul Michael Pickett, Joel Plasco, Savanna Leasing LLC. Attorney Jude Christopher Cooper added to party Joel Plasco(pty:dft). (Cooper, Jude) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Report)(Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference re-set for 1/17/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by David Alan Boyer, Odyssey Engines, LLC, Paul Michael Pickett, Savanna Leasing LLC. Responses due by 12/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Cooper, Jude) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan Benjamin Berger on behalf of David Alan Boyer, Odyssey Engines, LLC, Paul Michael Pickett, Savanna Leasing LLC. Attorney Evan Benjamin Berger added to party David Alan Boyer(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Benjamin Berger added to party Odyssey Engines, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Benjamin Berger added to party Paul Michael Pickett(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Benjamin Berger added to party Savanna Leasing LLC(pty:dft). (Berger, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting in part #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint Until on or Before January 9, 2020 re #1 Complaint by David Alan Boyer, Odyssey Engines, LLC, Paul Michael Pickett, Savanna Leasing LLC. Responses due by 12/24/2019 (Cooper, Jude) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jude Christopher Cooper on behalf of David Alan Boyer, Odyssey Engines, LLC, Paul Michael Pickett, Savanna Leasing LLC. Attorney Jude Christopher Cooper added to party David Alan Boyer(pty:dft), Attorney Jude Christopher Cooper added to party Odyssey Engines, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jude Christopher Cooper added to party Paul Michael Pickett(pty:dft), Attorney Jude Christopher Cooper added to party Savanna Leasing LLC(pty:dft). (Cooper, Jude) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Alberto J. Campain. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Lawrence C. Ecoff. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 12/20/2019, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2020 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lawrence C. Ecoff. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12180450 by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP. Responses due by 12/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alberto J. Campain. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12180232 by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP. Responses due by 12/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP. Paul Michael Pickett served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP. Savanna Leasing LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP. Odyssey Engines, LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP. David Alan Boyer served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Odyssey Engines, LLC, Paul Michael Pickett, Joel Plasco, Savanna Leasing LLC. (cqs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP re 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es), #5 Order to Show Cause (Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - All Made out to same party David Allen Boyer. (fillable forms need to be flattened before uploading) (cqs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to David Alan Boyer. (cqs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP re #1 Complaint filed by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP, #5 Order to Show Cause (Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Opportunity Fund (Cayman), LP, Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP re #1 Complaint Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12142627, filed by OPPORTUNITY FUND (CAYMAN), LP, ORBIS OPPORTUNITY FUND, LP.(Kellogg, Lawrence) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orbis Opportunity Fund, LP et al v. Boyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Alan Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Michael Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odyssey Engines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVANNA LEASING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Plasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPPORTUNITY FUND (CAYMAN), LP
Represented By: James S. Green
Represented By: Jared Thomas Green
Represented By: Lawrence C. Ecoff
Represented By: Alberto J. Campain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORBIS OPPORTUNITY FUND, LP
Represented By: James S. Green
Represented By: Jared Thomas Green
Represented By: Lawrence C. Ecoff
Represented By: Alberto J. Campain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?