BROWN v. ARMSTRONG et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM FOSTER BROWN, JR
Defendant: DDOJ, JOHN DOE, DAG SEAN P. LUGG, DETECTIVE JAMES C. ARMSTRONG and New Castle County Police Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00050
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-09883. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order transferring case to the District of Delaware;. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/14/2019. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from WILLIAM FOSTER BROWN, JR; re: Change of address and request for an extension of time to file response. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by WILLIAM FOSTER BROWN, JR (Docket Sheet sent) (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Petitioner's IFP application and directing the Clerk to reopen this case. ORDERED that summons shall not issue at this time as the Courts sua sponte screening has not yet been completed etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/22/2019. (cry, N.M.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by WILLIAM FOSTER BROWN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope)(ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that the clerk shall supply petitioner with a blank IFP Application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of this order.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/1/2019. (ssp, n.m. and IFP ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/1/2019. (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Affidavit, #3 Envelope)(cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. ARMSTRONG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAG SEAN P. LUGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE JAMES C. ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Castle County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM FOSTER BROWN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?