Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc.
Defendant: Transcanada USA Services, Inc., Welded Construction, LP and Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00092
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/21/2020. (rwc)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 Record of case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number in Other District: 5:19-cv-00320. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
January 22, 2020 Case transferred to District of Delaware. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The #7 Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED IN PART. This matter is hereby ORDERED TRANSFERRED to the District of Delaware. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/22/20. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc. Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (Hughes, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc.. (Hughes, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL. Counts II and III of the Complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/7/20. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada USA Services, Inc.. (Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL filed by Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc.. (Hughes, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC and Transcanada USA Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COUNT IV OF PLAINTIFF'S #1 COMPLAINT. by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC and Transcanada USA Services, Inc.(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from US Bankruptcy Court, (case number 5:19-ap-55), filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 1 (second), #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D)(cmd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 NDWV BC Docket Sheet)(cmd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcanada USA Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welded Construction, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?