Sunbelt Tractor & Equipment Company v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Tractor & Equipment Company
Defendant: Transcanada USA Services, Inc., Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC and Welded Construction, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00096
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/21/2020. (lak)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 Record of case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number in Other District: 5:19-cv-00323. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
January 22, 2020 Case transferred to District of Delaware. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: the #6 Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Columbia) is GRANTED IN PART; this matter is hereby ORDERED TRANSFERRED to the District of Delaware. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/22/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Sunbelt Tractor & Equipment Company Notice of Non-Opposition to #6 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (Hughes, Charles) Modified on 1/22/2020 to link with Motion to Transfer (nmm). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by Sunbelt Tractor & Equipment Company. (Hughes, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #3 MOTION TO DISMISS: Counts II and Ill of the Complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/7/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada USA Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Envelope D, #5 Exhibit E)(Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada USA Services Inc.. (Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sunbelt Tractor & Equipment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hughes, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from US Bankruptcy Court, (case number 18-12378 (ap-54)), filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (attachments to be filed separately due to large size) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2019: #1 Exhibit A - part 1, #2 Exhibit A - part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmm). Modified on 12/3/2019 to attach Exhibits; NEF Regenerated (nmm). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 US Bankruptcy Court Docket) (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunbelt Tractor & Equipment Company v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcanada USA Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welded Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Tractor & Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?