Carter v. LogMeIn, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Carter
Defendant: David J. Henshall, William R. Wagner, Peter J. Sacripanti, Steven J. Benson, Sara C. Andrews, LogMeIn, Inc., Robert M. Calderoni, Ita Brennan, Edwin J. Gillis and Michael J. Christenson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00124
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to 45 days after lead plaintiff files a consolidated amended complaint filed by William Carter. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/25/20. (ntl)
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Service of Process and Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by William Carter re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to 45 days after lead plaintiff files a consolidated amended complaint (Van Gorder, Michael)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to 45 days after lead plaintiff files a consolidated amended complaint - filed by William Carter. (Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. Sara C. Andrews served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. Ita Brennan served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. Michael J. Christenson served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. Peter J. Sacripanti served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. David J. Henshall served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. Steven J. Benson served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. Edwin J. Gillis served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. William R. Wagner served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. Robert M. Calderoni served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Carter. LogMeIn, Inc. served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
January 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00098-LPS, 1:20-cv-00124-LPS, 1:20-cv-00129-LPS (rjb)
January 27, 2020 Remark: Summons mailed to Counsel's office per request on 1/27/2020. (lak)
January 24, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sara C. Andrews on 1/27/2020; Steven J. Benson on 1/27/2020; Ita Brennan on 1/27/2020; Robert M. Calderoni on 1/27/2020; Michael J. Christenson on 1/27/2020; Edwin J. Gillis on 1/27/2020; David J. Henshall on 1/27/2020; LogMeIn, Inc. on 1/27/2020; Peter J. Sacripanti on 1/27/2020; William R. Wagner on 1/27/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT for Violations of Sections 14(a) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 filed with Jury Demand against Sara C. Andrews, Steven J. Benson, Ita Brennan, Robert M. Calderoni, Michael J. Christenson, Edwin J. Gillis, David J. Henshall, LogMeIn, Inc., Peter J. Sacripanti, William R. Wagner - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2835438.) - filed by William Carter. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Proposed Lead Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. LogMeIn, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Henshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Sacripanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara C. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LogMeIn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Calderoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ita Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin J. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Carter
Represented By: Michael D. Van Gorder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?