Abbott v. Mette et al
Plaintiff: Richard L. Abbott
Defendant: Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Gary F. Traynor, Collins J. Seitz, Jr., James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala, Karen L. Valihura and Luke W. Mette
Case Number: 1:2020cv00131
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 STIPULATION to Extend Brief Deadline (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #17 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief due 4/20/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2020. (nms)
March 26, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Brief Deadline - filed by Richard L. Abbott. (Abbott, Richard) Modified on 3/26/2020 (nms).
March 23, 2020 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Luke W. Mette, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/6/2020. (Davis, Patricia) Modified on 3/23/2020 (nms).
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Luke W. Mette, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala. (Davis, Patricia) Modified on 3/23/2020 (nms).
March 9, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Luke E. Mette, Kathleen M. Vavala, Collins J. Seitz, Jr., James T. Vaughn, Jr., Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Gary F. Traynor, and Karen L. Valihura - filed by Richard L. Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-S)(Abbott, Richard) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nms).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 STIPULATION to Extend Brief Deadlines (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief due 3/10/2020, Reply Brief due 3/17/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/25/2020. (nms)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Brief Deadlines - filed by Richard L. Abbott. (Abbott, Richard) Modified on 2/25/2020 (nms).
February 19, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #14 has been replaced per counsel's request. The cover page of the filing has been amended to remove the signature line. The NEF for the filing has been regenerated. (nms)
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Luke W. Mette, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2020. (Davis, Patricia) (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/19/2020) (nms).
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Luke W. Mette, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala. (Davis, Patricia) Modified on 2/19/2020 (nms).
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (D.I. #3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2020. (nms)
February 2, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Richard L. Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Abbott, Richard) Modified on 2/3/2020 (nms).
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Luke W. Mette, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala. (Davis, Patricia) Modified on 1/31/2020 (nms).
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Davis on behalf of Luke W. Mette, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala (Davis, Patricia)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Jean McCowan on behalf of Luke W. Mette, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala (McCowan, Allison)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George Thomas Lees, III on behalf of Luke W. Mette, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala (Lees, George)
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Richard L. Abbott, Esq., providing courtesy copies. (Abbott, Richard) Modified on 1/30/2020 (nms).
January 30, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Richard L. Abbott. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Served Vavala, #2 Summons Served Seitz, #3 Summons Served Vaughn, #4 Summons Served Montgomery-Reeves, #5 Summons Served Traynor, #6 Summons Served Valihura)(Abbott, Richard)
January 28, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve each Defendant with the Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and this Oral Order by the close of business TODAY, 1/28/2020 and shall file proofs of service evidencing same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any Defendant wishes to file a response to the Motion, such response shall be filed by NOON on Friday, 1/31/2020. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/28/2020. (dlw)
January 28, 2020 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (MN). (nmg)
January 28, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Luke W. Mette on 1/28/2020; Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves on 1/28/2020; Collins J. Seitz, Jr on 1/28/2020; Gary F. Traynor on 1/28/2020; Karen L. Valihura on 1/28/2020; James T. Vaughn, Jr. on 1/28/2020; Kathleen M. Vavala on 1/28/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - filed by Richard L. Abbott. (nmg) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/28/2020) (nmg).
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Luke W. Mette, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr., Kathleen M. Vavala - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2836612.) - filed by Richard L. Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Letter Requesting Expedited Status, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott v. Mette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Represented By: Allison Jean McCowan
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary F. Traynor
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Represented By: Allison Jean McCowan
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins J. Seitz, Jr.
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Represented By: Allison Jean McCowan
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Vaughn, Jr.
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Represented By: Allison Jean McCowan
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Vavala
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Represented By: Allison Jean McCowan
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Valihura
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Represented By: Allison Jean McCowan
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke W. Mette
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Represented By: Allison Jean McCowan
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Abbott
Represented By: Richard L Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?