ID Image Sensing LLC v. Omnivision Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: ID Image Sensing LLC
Defendant: Omnivision Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00136
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to March 30, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Omnivision Technologies, Inc. answer due 3/30/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/25/2020. (nms)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to March 30, 2020 - filed by Omnivision Technologies, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 2/25/2020 (nms).
February 18, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan T. Suder for ID Image Sensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 18, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dave R. Gunter for ID Image Sensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan T. Suder, Corby R. Vowell, and Dave R. Gunter, filed by ID Image Sensing LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/13/2020. (nms)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan T. Suder, Corby R. Vowell, and Dave R. Gunter - filed by ID Image Sensing LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ID Image Sensing LLC. Omnivision Technologies, Inc. served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Farnan, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Alias Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Omnivision Technologies, Inc. on 2/6/2020. (kmd)
February 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 29, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Omnivision Technologies, Inc. on 1/29/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for ID Image Sensing LLC filed by ID Image Sensing LLC. (mal)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,333,145 B2. (mal)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Omnivision Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2838685.) - filed by ID Image Sensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ID Image Sensing LLC v. Omnivision Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ID Image Sensing LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Jonathan T. Suder
Represented By: Dave R. Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnivision Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?