Carter v. Wesley
Plaintiff: Jermaine Layton Carter
Defendant: Bureau Chief Steven Wesley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00173
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed at least 3 actions that were dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim, and plaintiff does not claim to be in imminent danger. Plaintiff has 30 days to reinstate this action by paying the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to submit filing fee shall result in dismissal. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 5/4/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/2/2020. (nmf)
February 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Steven Wesley - filed by Jermaine Layton Carter. (NO IFP, NO FEE PAID). (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Layton Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau Chief Steven Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?