Coleman v. Metzger et al
Plaintiff: Devin L. Coleman
Defendant: Captain Randall Dotson and Warden Dana Metzger
Case Number: 1:2020cv00176
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Randall Dotson, Dana Metzger- filed by Devin L. Coleman.(nmf)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 Authorization by Devin L. Coleman requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (sam)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Amend D.I. #3 Complaint, and MOTION to Vacate D.I. #7 MOTION to Withdraw D.I. 3 Complaint - filed by Devin L. Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Porposed amended complaint)(sam)
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 Letter MOTION to Withdraw D.I. #3 Complaint - filed by Devin L. Coleman. (mal)
February 13, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Re Docketed Order (DI6) Using the proper event code. (apk)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $$350 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $$2.36 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/16/2020.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 02/13/2020. (apk)
February 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Devin L. Coleman. (nmg)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Randall Dotson and Dana Metzger - filed by Devin L. Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(nmg)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement by Devin L. Coleman (nmg)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Devin L. Coleman. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Metzger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Randall Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dana Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?