Saunders v. Connections Community Support Programs et al
Plaintiff: Robert Saunders
Defendant: Connections Community Support Programs, Andrew Peruchi, Ernest Kulhanek, Deputy Warden N. Hollingsworth, James Elders and James Elder
Case Number: 1:2020cv00184
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay Litigation filed by Robert Saunders. (apk)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Stay; GRANTING #9 Motion to Stay - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all deadlines in this case are STAYED until May 15, 2020 or the date the Fifth Modification of the Declaration of a State of Emergency is lifted, whichever is earlier. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/27/2020. (dlw)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Litigation - filed by James Elder, N. Hollingsworth, Ernest Kulhanek, Andrew Peruchi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certification)(Lees, George) Modified on 3/27/2020 (dlw).
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - filed by Robert Saunders. (kmd)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay - filed by Robert Saunders. (kmd) Modified filing date (kmd).
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Set Briefing Schedule: re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Answering Brief due 4/26/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/3/2020. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 3/3/3020*** (dlw)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Robert Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(apk)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Enlargement of Time re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Robert Saunders. (kmd)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Elder, N. Hollingsworth, Ernest Kulhanek, Andrew Peruchi.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wan, Kenneth)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by James Elder, N. Hollingsworth, Ernest Kulhanek, Andrew Peruchi. (Wan, Kenneth)
February 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N20C-01-023 JRJ - filed by Andrew Peruchi, N. Hollingsworth, James Elders, Ernest Kulhanek. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2846118). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) Modified on 2/12/2020 (kmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Connections Community Support Programs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connections Community Support Programs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Peruchi
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Kulhanek
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden N. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Elders
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Elder
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?