Brittingham v. Akinbayo et al.
Petitioner: Malachi Brittingham
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Delaware and Kolawole Akinbayo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00190
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to Clerk of Court from Malachi Brittingham requesting relief from multiple indictments. (nmg)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to the Court from Malachi Brittinghjam regarding volunteer work and recovery therapy. (amf)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to the Court from Malachi Brittingham enclosing documents to be placed on the record previously submitted to state court. (amf)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Clerk of Court from Malachi Brittingham, dated 2/29/2020 regarding Administrative Segregation. (myr)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBITS in support of #3 Amended Petition by Malachi Brittingham. (lak)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Malachi Brittingham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A+B, #2 Exhibit in support)(sam)
February 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (No IFP, No Fee Paid) - filed by Malachi Brittingham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittingham v. Akinbayo et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kolawole Akinbayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Malachi Brittingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?