Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund et al v. Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund, Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund and Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund
Defendant: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00194
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. DelTergo, Esquire filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund, Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/7/2020. (dlw)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. DelTergo, Esquire - filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund, Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Crowther, Curtis)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/20/2020. (dlw)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc..(Schiltz, Todd)
March 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory J. Ossi, and Christopher R. Williams for Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Williams and Gregory J. Ossi of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP filed by Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/3/2020. (dlw)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc. answer due 3/20/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/3/2020. (dlw)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Williams and Gregory J. Ossi of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP - filed by Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher R. Williams, #2 Certification of Gregory J. Ossi)(Schiltz, Todd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File its Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to and Including March 20, 2020 re #1 Complaint,,, by Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.. (Schiltz, Todd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd C. Schiltz on behalf of Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc. (Schiltz, Todd)
February 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 10, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc. on 2/10/2020. (sam)
February 10, 2020 No Summons Issued. (apk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2848049.) - filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund, Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund et al v. Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Todd C. Schiltz
Represented By: Christopher R. Williams
Represented By: Gregory J. Ossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?