In re: US Investigations Services, LLC
Appellee: US Investigations Services, LLC
Appellant: Perry Kyiem Forrest
Case Number: 1:2020cv00223
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Appeal filed on February 14, 2020 (D.I. #1 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/16/2020. (nms)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appeal - filed by Perry Kyiem Forrest. (amf)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/28/20. ***A copy of this Recommendation was mailed to appellant to his address of record on 2/28/20*** (cak)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Daniel Y. Pyon, filed by US Investigations Services, LLC, and #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Elie J. Worenklein, filed by US Investigations Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/25/2020. (nms)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motions and Orders for Admission Pro Hac Vice served on Perry Kyiem Forrest, III on 2/25/20, filed by US Investigations Services, LLC. (Justison, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Elie J. Worenklein - filed by US Investigations Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Justison, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Daniel Y. Pyon - filed by US Investigations Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Justison, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER: The motions for pro hac vice appearance (D.I. #5 ; D.I. #6 ) are DENIED without prejudice to renew. Certifications by counsel need to be dated as to the date they were signed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/25/2020. (nms)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elie J. Worenklein - filed by US Investigations Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Justison, Elizabeth)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Y. Pyon - filed by US Investigations Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Justison, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Appellant will pay the $298 filing fee, payable to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, or submit a complete application to proceed without prepayment of fees (AO Form 239) to the United States District Court. Appellant's failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this appeal without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/20/2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 AO Form 239) (kmd)
February 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Pursuant to this Courts Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court under to 28 U.S.C. 158; IT IS ORDERED that a teleconference has been scheduled for Wednesday, February 26, 2020 at 12:00 Noon Eastern Time with Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge related to the screening process for mediation. Counsel for Appellee shall initiate the teleconference call. Local counsel are reminded of their obligations to inform out-of-state counsel of this Order. To avoid the imposition of sanctions, counsel shall advise the Court immediately of any problems regarding compliance with this Order. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/18/20. ***Mailed to Appellant to her address on record on 2/18/20. (cak)
February 14, 2020 Remark: Copy of docket sheet to Pro Se Appellant. (mal)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mal)
February 14, 2020 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (mal)
February 14, 2020 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (mal)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 01/30/2020 by Honorable Judge Karen B. Owens in Bankruptcy case number 15-10262. Fee Status not Paid. No IFP.- filed by Perry Kyiem Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Order on Appeal)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: US Investigations Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Investigations Services, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Bartley
Represented By: Edmon L. Morton
Represented By: Elizabeth Soper Justison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Perry Kyiem Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?