Early v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kenneth H. Early, Jr.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00242
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 03/02/2020. (sam) Modified on 3/3/2020 (nms).
February 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Medical Records - re #2 Complaint (Pro Se) filed by Kenneth H. Early, Jr. (sam)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against United States of America (No fee paid)(Missing pages 5, 6, 8) - filed by Kenneth H. Early, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Kenneth H. Early, Jr. (sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Early v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth H. Early, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?