Estate of Alta Marie Morris v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Estate of Alta Marie Morris
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00274
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #4 . (dlw)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Estate of Alta Marie Morris as to Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. (Gouge, Donald)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on U.S. Bank, N.A. on March 5, 2020, filed by Estate of Alta Marie Morris. (Gouge, Donald)
March 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 25, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to U.S. Bank, N.A. on 2/25/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (apk)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against U.S. Bank, N.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2862795.) - filed by Estate of Alta Marie Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Alta Marie Morris v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Alta Marie Morris
Represented By: Donald L. Gouge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?