Williams v. Atlantic Recording Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Terry Williams
Defendant: TIMOTHY ZACHARY MOSLEY, TIMBALAND, ESTATE OF AALIYAH HAUGHTON, Warner Music Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elecktra Entertainment Group, Inc., Atlantic Records, Warner Music Group, Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Elektra Records and Warner Music Group, Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00316
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 80 Letter to Judge Andrews, from Terry Williams, responding to the Court's Oral Order (D.I. 76 ). (amf) Modified on 4/30/2020 (nms).
April 29, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint - filed by Terry Williams. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(amf) Modified on 4/30/2020 (nms).
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah Schacter, filed by Elecktra Entertainment Group, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Music Group, Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/8/2020. (nms)
April 8, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah Schacter - filed by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elecktra Entertainment Group, Inc., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Warner Music Group, Corporation, Warner Music Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Gregory)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #77 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barry Slotnick, filed by Elecktra Entertainment Group, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Music Group, Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/7/2020. (nms)
April 7, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barry Slotnick - filed by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elecktra Entertainment Group, Inc., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Warner Music Group, Corporation, Warner Music Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Gregory)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORAL ORDER: The Court will rule on the Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #49 ) on the record already established, unless further briefing is requested. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/2/2020. (nms)
April 1, 2020 Filing 75 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Gregory B. Williams, regarding Local Rule 81.2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Gregory) Modified on 4/1/2020 (nms).
April 1, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Brian Williams on behalf of All Defendants (Williams, Gregory)
March 12, 2020 Filing 73 Letter to Barry I. Slotnick, Sarah Schacter and Heather Reardon Olson, from the Clerk of Court, advising of Local Counsel requirement (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/13/2020). (mal) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nms).
March 12, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Added proper defendants and terminated Motions pursuant to instructions by the Pro-Se Law Clerk. (rwc)
March 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 3, 2020 Remark: Copy of Docket Sheet was mailed to the Plaintiff. (mal)
March 3, 2020 Filing 72 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:18-cv-05418. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
February 25, 2020 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION for Clarification MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION to Vacate filed by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KRATT, JACOB) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION, RECONSIDERATION (RULE 59) AND OR TO VACATE ORDER (RULE 60), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by TERRY WILLIAMS. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*.(rf, ) Modified on 2/11/2020 (rf, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT ELLIOTT'S #50 MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY, PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST ELLIOTT ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/6/20.2/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE & COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT CLAIMS AGAINST MOVING DEFENDANTS ARE SEVERED AND TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF DELAWARE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/28/2020. 1/29/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/28/2020. 1/29/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 66 Letter dated 1/27/2020 by TERRY WILLIAMS (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE BY 2/4/2020, WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE AND/OR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/14/2020. 1/14/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 64 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED BY MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #62 ) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET DEFENDANT ELLIOTT'S REPLY AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/12/2019.8/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT.Brief and Certificate of Service.(KRATT, JACOB) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 61 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MELISSA ELLIOT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (RE: DOC. NO. #50 ), WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY TERRY WILLIAMS. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION A/K/A ATLANTIC RECORDS, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC. A/K/A ELEKTRA RECORDS, WARNER MUSIC INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., AND RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE (DOC. NO. #56 ) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET CORPORATE DEFENDANTS' REPLY AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/30/2019.7/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. 54) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE HIS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 50) BY 8/2/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/29/19. 7/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 57 Declaration re #49 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC.. (OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC..brief and certificate of service.(OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY TERRY WILLIAMS.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit AMENDED COMPLAINT)(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 54 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY TERRY WILLIAMS.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF TERRY WILLIAMS' REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (DOC. NO. #52 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/17/2019. 7/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 52 Request for Default TERRY WILLIAMS against ESTATE OF AALIYAH HAUGHTON, TIMOTHY ZACHARY MOSLEY. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. NO ENVELOPE INCLUDED. (amas) Modified on 7/17/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 51 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DI 49), FILED BY TERRY WILLIAMS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. NO ENVELOPE INCLUDED.(amas) Modified on 7/17/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A- Blackground- One in a Million- Aailyah (Copyright), #4 Exhibit B- (96-11-4) Blackground Atlantic Reg for Heartbroken, #5 Exhibit C-(97-6-12) Blackground Atlantic Reg for Heartbroken, #6 Exhibit D- (01-11-13) Blackground Records for Heartbroken), #7 Exhibit E-Terry Williams Heartbroken Registration re: Music, #8 Exhibit F-Terry Williams Heartbroken Registration Sound Recording, #9 Exhibit G-Billboard Article (8-4-01), #10 Exhibit H-Billboard Article (2-1-97), #11 Exhibit I- RS Top 100 of the 90S, #12 Exhibit J- Vibe Article, #13 Exhibit K- RIAA, #14 Declaration of Missy Elliott, #15 Text of Proposed Order, #16 Certificate of Service)(KRATT, JACOB) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC..MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration OF BRAD COHEN, #4 Declaration OF RELL LAFARGUE, #5 Certificate of Service)(OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT UNTIL 7/12/2019 (DOC. NO. #45 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 6/28/2019.6/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #18 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 6/28/2019.6/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #20 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 6/28/2019.6/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 Amended Complaint, filed by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KRATT, JACOB) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, against ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT, ESTATE OF AALIYAH HAUGHTON, TIMOTHY ZACHARY MOSLEY, RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC., filed by TERRY WILLIAMS.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 43 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, BY TERRY WILLIAMS.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW (DOC. NO. #41 ) IS GRANTED AND THE FIRM OF MATTLEMAN, WEINROTH & MILLER, P.C. IS WITHDRAWN AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/31/2019.5/31/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw APPEARANCE OF MATTLEMAN, WEINROTH & MILLER filed by TERRY WILLIAMS..(NECHEMIA, ASHLEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S LETTER REQUEST IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY NO LATER THAN 6/19/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/29/2019. 5/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #36 ) IS GRANTED AND ASHLEY S. NECHEMIA, ESQUIRE IS RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/28/2019.5/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 38 Letter from TERRY WILLIAMS TO JUDGE QUNONES RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TERRY WILLIAMS (NECHEMIA, ASHLEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by TERRY WILLIAMS.Certificate of Counsel.(NECHEMIA, ASHLEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service by B&R Services re: served Complaint upon The Estate of Aaliyah Haughton c/o Barry E. Hankerson by Personal service on 01/05/2019 (NECHEMIA, ASHLEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH THE CLERK OF COURT FOR ENTRY OF A DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT TIMOTHY ZACHARY MOSLEY A/K/A TIMBALAND, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/22/2019. 5/23/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT, ESTATE OF AALIYAH HAUGHTON, BY 6/5/2019. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service by B&R Services re: served Complaint upon Timothy Zachary Mosley aka Timbaland by Adult in charge of residence, relations is live-in girlfriend on 03/19/2019 (NECHEMIA, ASHLEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF TERRY WILLIAMS' MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE (DOC. NO. #23 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/1/2019.3/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF TERRY WILLIAMS' MOTION TO REMAND (DOC. NO. #12 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/1/2019.3/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT'S MOTION (DOC. NO. #25 ) IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET THE REPLY (DOC. NO. #25 -1), AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/19/2019.2/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, AND WARNER MUSIC, INC.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION (DOC. NO. #24 ) IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET CORPORATE DEFENDANTS' REPLY (DOC. NO. #24 -1), AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/19/2019.2/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KRATT, JACOB) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION for Service filed by TERRY WILLIAMS.Affidavit of Due Diligence and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Due Diligence with Exhibits, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(NECHEMIA, ASHLEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TERRY WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NECHEMIA, ASHLEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by TERRY WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NECHEMIA, ASHLEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT.Brief, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KRATT, JACOB) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Court of Common Pleas filed by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Certificate of Service)(KRATT, JACOB) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Brad Cohen, #4 Declaration of Rell Lafargue, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Court of Common Pleas filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOSEPH G. COLAO, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/7/2019. 1/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND TO JOSEPH COLAO WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL A. TRAUBEN, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/7/2019. 1/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND TO MICHAEL TRAUBEN WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT, IS GRANTED AN EXTENSIO OF TIME, UNTIL 1/22/2019, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/7/2019. 1/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Court of Common Pleas filed by TERRY WILLIAMS.Notice of Motion, Motion to Remand, Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Motion, #2 Supplement Motion to Remand, #3 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(NECHEMIA, ASHLEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph G. Colao by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13262901.). (KRATT, JACOB) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. with Certificate of Service by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC..(OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC..(OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Trauben by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13259064.). (KRATT, JACOB) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SARAH SCHACTER TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/21/2018. 12/26/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(nd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF BARRY I. SLOTNICK, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/21/2018. 12/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO BARRY SLOTNICK WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, AND WARNER MUSIC, INC. ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 1/22/2019, TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/21/2018. 12/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of BARRY I. SLOTNICK by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13242426.). (OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of SARAH SCHACTER by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13242406.). (OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER REARDON OLSON on behalf of ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC. with certificate of service(OLSON, HEATHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 181101709. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 189491)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Atlantic Recording Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY ZACHARY MOSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMBALAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF AALIYAH HAUGHTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elecktra Entertainment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Records
Represented By: Gregory Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Group
Represented By: Gregory Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reservoir Media Management, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elektra Records
Represented By: Gregory Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Group, Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?