Labrador Diagnostics LLC v. BioFire Diagnostics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Labrador Diagnostics LLC
Defendant: BioMerieux S.A. and BioFire Diagnostics, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00348
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Adam R. Brausa, Eneda Hoxha, Annie A. Lee and Joyce C. Li of DURIE TANGRI filed by BioMerieux S.A., BioFire Diagnostics, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/25/2020. (nmf)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to June 30, 2020 filed by BioMerieux S.A., BioFire Diagnostics, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: BioFire Diagnostics, LLC answer due 6/30/2020; BioMerieux S.A. answer due 6/30/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/25/2020. (nmf)
March 25, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to June 30, 2020 - filed by BioFire Diagnostics, LLC, BioMerieux S.A.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Adam R. Brausa, Eneda Hoxha, Annie A. Lee and Joyce C. Li of DURIE TANGRI - filed by BioFire Diagnostics, LLC, BioMerieux S.A.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Labrador Diagnostics LLC. BioFire Diagnostics, LLC served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Farnan, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to BioFire Diagnostics, LLC on 3/10/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,283,155 B2 ;US 10,533,994 B2. (myr)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 LABRADOR DIAGNOSTICS LLC'S COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against BioFire Diagnostics, LLC, BioMerieux S.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2873445.) - filed by Labrador Diagnostics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labrador Diagnostics LLC v. BioFire Diagnostics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioMerieux S.A.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioFire Diagnostics, LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labrador Diagnostics LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?