Kennedy v. SLM Corporation
Plaintiff: Kwane Kennedy
Defendant: SLM Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00353
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SLM Corporation.(Shauger, Dean)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Baldwin - filed by SLM Corporation. (Shauger, Dean)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bonnie Martin - filed by SLM Corporation. (Shauger, Dean)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 8, 2020 filed by SLM Corporation, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: SLM Corporation answer due 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/2/2020. (fms)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 8, 2020 - filed by SLM Corporation. (Shauger, Dean)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean J. Shauger on behalf of SLM Corporation (Shauger, Dean)
March 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 12, 2020 Remark: Summons mailed per request of counsel. (nmg)
March 12, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to SLM Corporation on 3/12/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against SLM Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2875875) - filed by Kwane Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. SLM Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLM Corporation
Represented By: Dean J. Shauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwane Kennedy
Represented By: Daniel Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?