Heer et al v. ViacomCBS, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leo Heer and Valene T. Heer
Defendant: Crane Co., General Dynamics Corporation and ViacomCBS, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00375
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Leo Heer by General Dynamics Corporation. (Heyden, Michael)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 6/1/2020 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 5/27/2020. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/21/2020. (lih)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. re #12 Order. (Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 4/20/2020 (lih).
April 13, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #14 has been modified to reflect that the document is an ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Counsel is advised to use the appropriate event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by General Dynamics Corporation.(Heyden, Michael) Modified on 4/13/2020 (lih).
April 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Leo Heer on April 14, 2020 filed by Leo Heer, Valene T. Heer.(Hrubiec, R.)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/7/2020. (lih)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher G. Conley, Esq. - filed by ViacomCBS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Admission)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Texter, Allison)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO ORDERED re #9 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party Crane Co. terminated. Attorney Francis C. Gondek terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/7/2020. (dlw)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher G. Conley. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/7/2020. (lih)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik C. DiMarco. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/7/2020. (lih)
April 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Erik C. DiMarco for General Dynamics Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Crane Co. by Leo Heer, Valene T. Heer. (Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 4/7/2020 (dlw).
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik C. DiMarco - filed by General Dynamics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Erik C. DiMarco)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Heyden, Michael)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by General Dynamics Corporation. (Heyden, Michael)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 JOINDER by General Dynamics Corporation, joining in #1 Notice of Removal and Independent Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Heyden, Michael) Modified on 3/25/2020 (lih).
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying filed by Crane Co.. (Gondek, Francis)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
March 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 18, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS, Inc. filed by ViacomCBS, Inc. (sam)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior CT, Case Number N20C-02-060 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2878919)- filed by ViacomCBS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heer et al v. ViacomCBS, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Erik C. DiMarco
Represented By: Michael C. Heyden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS, Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Heer
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valene T. Heer
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?