Alley et al v. Williamson et al
Plaintiff: Cieann Alley and Brian Conway
Defendant: Raymond Williamson and Ryan Williamson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00384
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Ryan Williamson on 03/27/2020, filed by Cieann Alley, Cieann Alley(as a parent and natural guardian of A.M., a minor), Brian Conway, Brian Conway(as parent and natural guardian of Z.C., a minor). (Sacchetta, Tyler)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons served on Raymond Williamson on 03/19/2020, filed by Cieann Alley, Cieann Alley(as a parent and natural guardian of A.M., a minor), Brian Conway, Brian Conway(as parent and natural guardian of Z.C., a minor). (Sacchetta, Tyler)
March 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 18, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Raymond Williamson on 3/18/2020; Ryan Williamson on 3/18/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam)
March 18, 2020 No Summons Issued. (Due to formatting issue. Please contact the Clerk's office at 302-573-6170 between the hours of 8:30am-4pm) (sam)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Raymond Williamson, Ryan Williamson - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2879954.) - filed by Cieann Alley, Brian Conway, Cieann Alley(as a parent and natural guardian of A.M., a minor), Brian Conway(as parent and natural guardian of Z.C., a minor). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alley et al v. Williamson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cieann Alley
Represented By: Tyler Sacchetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Conway
Represented By: Tyler Sacchetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?