Tom Hussey Photography, LLC v. BDG Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tom Hussey Photography, LLC
Defendant: BDG Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00404
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #13 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Opposition and Reply Deadlines to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of New York to Opposition to May 22, 2020; Reply to June 5, 2020 (Set Briefing Schedule: re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue - Answering Brief due 5/22/2020. Reply Brief due 6/5/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/13/2020. (dlw)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Opposition and Reply Deadlines to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of New York to Opposition to May 22, 2020; Reply to June 5, 2020 - filed by Tom Hussey Photography, LLC. (Wrobel, Mackenzie)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Jessica Stukonis re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by BDG Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shandler, Chad) Modified on 5/4/2020 (dlw).
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Bradley Mullins re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by BDG Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L)(Shandler, Chad) Modified on 5/4/2020 (dlw).
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by BDG Media, Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2020. (Shandler, Chad) Modified on 5/4/2020 (dlw).
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue - filed by BDG Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certification Pursuant to Rule 7.1.1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shandler, Chad) Modified on 5/4/2020 (dlw).
April 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven M. Cowley for Tom Hussey Photography, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
April 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eleanor M. Lackman, and Bradley J. Mullins for BDG Media, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Cowley filed by Tom Hussey Photography, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/17/2020. (dlw)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Cowley - filed by Tom Hussey Photography, LLC. (Wrobel, Mackenzie)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eleanor M. Lackman and Bradley J. Mullins filed by BDG Media, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/16/2020. (dlw)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eleanor M. Lackman and Bradley J. Mullins - filed by BDG Media, Inc.. (Shandler, Chad)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 1, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: BDG Media, Inc. answer due 5/1/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/9/2020. (dlw)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 1, 2020 - filed by BDG Media, Inc.. (Shandler, Chad)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tom Hussey Photography, LLC. BDG Media, Inc. served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Wrobel, Mackenzie)
March 26, 2020 Remark: Corrected summons issued as to defendant BDG Media, Inc. on 3/26/2020. (*Corrected summons emailed to Plaintiff's counsel) (amf)
March 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to BDG Media, Inc. (#1 Magistrate Consent Notice)(Please print out for use/service).(mal)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)VAu 990-319; VA 2-168-199;. (mal)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against BDG Media, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2882290.) - filed by Tom Hussey Photography, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tom Hussey Photography, LLC v. BDG Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDG Media, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Mullins
Represented By: Eleanor M. Lackman
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Pedi
Represented By: Chad Michael Shandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Hussey Photography, LLC
Represented By: Mackenzie Marie Wrobel
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?