Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc., Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Limited and Lupin Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00415
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
April 29, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Carol M. Pitzel Cruz, William R. Zimmerman, and Andrea L. Cheek for Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Inc., Lupin Limited, and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
April 29, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jared L. Stringham for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
April 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Nicholas N. Kallas and Christina Schwarz for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
April 28, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Defendant Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc. are two separate parties, not one. Due to clerical error.(myr)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman, Carol Pitzel Cruz, and Andrea L. Cheek filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc., Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/28/20. (ntl)
April 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ewing, Alexandra)
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman, Carol Pitzel Cruz, and Andrea L. Cheek - filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Nanomi B.V. for Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc., Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc.; Corporate Parent Lupin, Ltd. for Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,404,744 . (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Patent/Trademark Report)(Cottrell, Frederick)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nichols N. Kallas, Christina Schwarz and Jared L. Stringham filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/15/20. (ntl)
April 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nichols N. Kallas, Christina Schwarz and Jared L. Stringham - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel of Nicholas N. Kallas, #2 Certification of Counsel of Christina Schwarz, #3 Certification of Counsel of Jared L. Stringham)(Silver, Daniel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: (Silver, Daniel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A. waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
March 24, 2020 No Summons Issued. (myr)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (myr)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,101,659 ;8,796,331 ;8,877,938 ;9,388,134. (myr)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: February 12, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 7/7/2023. (myr)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2884292.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A.
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Jared L. Stringham
Represented By: Nicholas N. Kallas
Represented By: Christina Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?