Sonohm Licensing LLC v. MilDef Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonohm Licensing LLC
Defendant: MilDef Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00423
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST for Default as to MilDef Inc. - filed by Sonohm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chong, Jimmy)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 03/30/2020 by Sonohm Licensing LLC re #1 Complaint, (Chong, Jimmy)
April 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Sonohm Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00422-LPS, 1:20-cv-00423-LPS(kmd)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:20-cv-00423-LPS) (6 in 1:20-cv-00422-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Sonohm Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/2/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00422-LPS, 1:20-cv-00423-LPS (ntl)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Sonohm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chong, Jimmy)
April 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00422-LPS, 1:20-cv-00423-LPS (rjb)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, Exhibit D to Complaint by Sonohm Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued (Please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Sonohm Licensing LLC. (kmd)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,651,207; 7,106,705. (kmd)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 Original COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against MilDef Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2885899.) - filed by Sonohm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonohm Licensing LLC v. MilDef Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonohm Licensing LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MilDef Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?