Stephenson v. May et al
Petitioner: Joshua Stephenson
Respondent: Warden Robert May and Kathy Jennings
Case Number: 1:2020cv00443
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to Judge Leonard P. Stark from Joshua Stephenson, dated 5/21/2020 regarding D.I. #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (myr)
April 13, 2020 Filing Fee Received from Joshua Stephenson: $ 5, receipt number DEX033676 (copy of receipt/report to business office). (kmd)
April 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Joshua Stephenson. (nmg)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Trust Fund Account Statement by Joshua Stephenson (nmg)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joshua Stephenson. (nmg)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Joshua Stephenson. (No IFP, No Fee Paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Robert May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathy Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?