Hendrick et al v.Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debra Hendrick and Jerry Hendrick
Defendant: Grinnell LLC, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Velan Valve Corp., ITT Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Crane Co., Honeywell International, Inc., CBS Corporation and IMO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00471
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 25 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Trane Technologies plc, Other Affiliate Aldrich Pump LLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tyler, Jessica)
May 8, 2020 Filing 24 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. regarding response re #21 Order. (Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 5/8/2020 (lih).
May 6, 2020 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corp. filed by Velan Valve Corp.. (Bradley, Paul)
May 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Bradley, Paul)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/24/2020. (lih)
April 16, 2020 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
April 14, 2020 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) for Eaton Corporation filed by Eaton Corporation. (Texter, Allison)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Skiles, Nicholas)
April 10, 2020 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Honeywell International, Inc. filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
April 10, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by John Crane, Inc.. (Bell, Tye)
April 9, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The answer previously filed as D.I. 14 has been deleted for failure to include a complete case caption. Counsel is advised to file a revised version of the document with a complete case caption. (lih)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
April 8, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
April 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries, Inc. for Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Company for Ingersoll-Rand Company filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tyler, Jessica)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Tyler, Jessica)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Tyler, Jessica)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co.. (Gondek, Francis)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate ViacomCBS Inc. for CBS Corporation filed by CBS Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of CBS Corporation (Valocchi, Beth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Cincilla, Amaryah K. Bocchino, Ryan William Browning, Tye C. Bell on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (myr)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group PLC for John Crane, Inc. filed by John Crane, Inc. (myr)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N20C-02-062 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2892906)- filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrick et al v.Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Tye C. Bell
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Smith
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hendrick
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hendrick
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?