XAPT Corporation v. Deere & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: XAPT Corporation
Defendant: Deere & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00477
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 42 REDACTED VERSION of #4 Appendix, #9 Redacted Document Complete Redacted Version of Appendix to the Notice of Removal by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Sharp, Melanie)
May 21, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Reply Brief at D.I. #41 has been linked to D.I. #26 and the docket text corrected. (fms)
May 21, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of Illinois, MOTION to Stay filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit C)(Sharp, Melanie) Modified on 5/21/2020 (fms).
May 20, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY BRIEF re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit G, I - L)(Sharp, Melanie)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #39 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Deere to File its Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss to May 20, 2020 filed by Deere & Company, Inc., Set Briefing Schedule: re #18 MOTION to Dismiss. (Reply Brief due 5/20/2020.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/19/2020. (fms)
May 18, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Deere to File its Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss to May 20, 2020 - filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Sharp, Melanie)
May 14, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of Illinois MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support filed by XAPT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Scaggs, Rudolph)
May 13, 2020 Filing 37 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from R. Judson Scaggs, Jr. regarding Subsequent Authority - re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Compliance)(Shen, Zi-Xiang)
May 11, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by XAPT Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Shen, Zi-Xiang)
May 11, 2020 Filing 35 REDACTED VERSION of #25 Answering Brief in Opposition, to XAPT's Motion to Remand by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Lee, Steven)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert P. Cummins filed by XAPT Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/11/2020. (fms)
May 11, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert P. Cummins - filed by XAPT Corporation. (Scaggs, Rudolph)
May 11, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer, #27 MOTION to Stay re #2 Notice of Removal, XAPT Corporation's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of the Motion for Remand filed by XAPT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Scaggs, Rudolph)
May 8, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Stay re #2 Notice of Removal, XAPT Corporation's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of the Motion for Remand, #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer filed by Deere & Company, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Text of Proposed Order on XAPT's Motion to Extend, #3 Text of Proposed Order on XAPT's Motion to Stay, #4 Exhibit A - B)(Sharp, Melanie)
May 8, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the SEALED Opening Brief and Certificate of Compliance at D.I. #19 have been removed and replaced. (fms)
May 7, 2020 Filing 31 REDACTED VERSION of #19 Opening Brief in Support, of its Motion to Dismiss by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Sharp, Melanie)
May 6, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Supplement to Notice of Related Cases by Deere & Company, Inc. re #8 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B)(Sharp, Melanie)
May 6, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer - filed by XAPT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Statement Pursuant to D. Del. L.R. 7.1.1, #4 Certificate of Compliance)(Scaggs, Rudolph)
May 4, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by XAPT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Shen, Zi-Xiang)
April 30, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay re #2 Notice of Removal, XAPT Corporation's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of the Motion for Remand - filed by XAPT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Statement L.R. 7.1.1, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scaggs, Rudolph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of Illinois, MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support - filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A - B)(Sharp, Melanie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 25 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Deere & Company, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Compliance with Type, Font, and Word Limitations, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - B)(Sharp, Melanie)
April 30, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ronnie L. White, II for Deere & Company, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
April 30, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Mary Ann L. Wymore, Lauren Jaffe, Mariangela Seale for Deere & Company, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Jaffe filed by Deere & Company, Inc., #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mariangela Seale filed by Deere & Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/30/2020. (fms)
April 30, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mariangela Seale - filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel)(Sharp, Melanie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Jaffe - filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel)(Sharp, Melanie)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary Ann L. Wymore filed by Deere & Company, Inc., #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronnie L. White II filed by Deere & Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/30/2020. (fms)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary Ann L. Wymore - filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel)(Sharp, Melanie)
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronnie L. White II - filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Sharp, Melanie)
April 28, 2020 Filing 20 Joint STATEMENT re #18 MOTION to Dismiss, #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by XAPT Corporation. (Shen, Zi-Xiang)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deere & Company, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #2 Exhibit A - H, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sharp, Melanie) (Main Document 19 replaced on 5/8/2020) (fms).
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sharp, Melanie)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #13 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. ORDER setting briefing schedule re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Answering Brief due 4/30/2020., Reply Brief due 5/7/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/27/2020. (nmf)
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by XAPT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Shen, Zi-Xiang)
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Deere & Company, Inc.. Amendment to #2 Notice of Removal, [CORRECTED] Civil Cover Sheet. (Lee, Steven)
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Deere & Company, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Compliance With Type, Font and Word Limitations, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - R)(Sharp, Melanie)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand - filed by XAPT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification Under D. Del. LR 7.1.1, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(Shen, Zi-Xiang)
April 20, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney S. Patrick McKey for Deere & Company, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent New Frontier Holding GmbH. for XAPT Corporation filed by XAPT Corporation. (Shen, Zi-Xiang)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by XAPT Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Shen, Zi-Xiang)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by XAPT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shen, Zi-Xiang)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 REDACTED VERSION of #4 Appendix of Filings in Support of Notice of Removal by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Sharp, Melanie)
April 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kara E.F. Cenar for Deere & Company, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kara E.F. Cenar and S. Patrick McKey filed by Deere & Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/9/2020. (nmf)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Cases by Deere & Company, Inc. (Sharp, Melanie)
April 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kara E.F. Cenar and S. Patrick McKey - filed by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications by Counsel)(Sharp, Melanie)
April 7, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (amf)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Appendix to Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/7/2020. (nms)
April 7, 2020 Remark: Motion to Seal forwarded to Duty Judge (RGA). (amf)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Cascade Investment, L.L.C. for Deere & Company, Inc. - filed by Deere & Company, Inc. (amf)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 [SEALED] APPENDIX of Confidential Filings in Support of D.I. #2 Notice of Removal - filed by Deere & Company, Inc. (amf)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Court, Case Number 2020-0252-JRS (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2894583)- filed by Deere & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Appendix to Notice of Removal - filed by Deere & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XAPT Corporation v. Deere & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XAPT Corporation
Represented By: Rudolph J. Scaggs, Jr.
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Represented By: Aubrey James Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie K. Sharp
Represented By: Steven W. Lee
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Ronnie L. White, II
Represented By: S. Patrick McKey
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Represented By: Lauren Jaffe
Represented By: Mary Ann L. Wymore
Represented By: Kara E.F. Cenar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?