Cohen et al v. Continental Motors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fred Cohen
Defendant: John Doe 1-50 and Continental Motors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00487
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Continental Motors, Inc.. (Brooks, Andrea)
May 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy A. Heisterhagen for Continental Motors, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy A. Heisterhagen filed by Continental Motors, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/15/20. (ntl)
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Michael S. Miska by Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Dennis Alan O'Neal, Deceased), Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Debra Dee O'Neal, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Farnan, Brian)
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Dennis Alan O'Neal, Deceased), Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Debra Dee O'Neal, Deceased).Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy A. Heisterhagen - filed by Continental Motors, Inc.. (Brooks, Andrea)
May 8, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lacey D. Smith for Continental Motors, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
May 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sherri R. Ginger for Continental Motors, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
May 5, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Arthur Alan Wolk,Michael S. Miska and Cynthia M. Devers for Fred Cohen and Fred Cohen added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lacey D. Smith filed by Continental Motors, Inc., #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sherri R. Ginger filed by Continental Motors, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/5/20. (ntl)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lacey D. Smith - filed by Continental Motors, Inc.. (Brooks, Andrea)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sherri R. Ginger - filed by Continental Motors, Inc.. (Brooks, Andrea)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arthur Alan Wolk, Michael S. Miska, and Cynthia M. Devers filed by Fred Cohen. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/4/20. (ntl)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arthur Alan Wolk, Michael S. Miska, and Cynthia M. Devers - filed by Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Dennis Alan O'Neal, Deceased), Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Debra Dee O'Neal, Deceased). (Farnan, Brian)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying filed by Continental Motors, Inc.. (Brooks, Andrea)
May 1, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Replaced main document Opening Brief (DI 6) per request of filer. (rwc)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Continental Motors, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L)(Brooks, Andrea) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/1/2020) (rwc).
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) - filed by Continental Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Andrea)
April 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Dennis Alan O'Neal, Deceased), Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Debra Dee O'Neal, Deceased). Continental Motors, Inc. served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Farnan, Joseph)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued at to Continental Motors, Inc. on 4/8/2020. Please print out for use/service. (lak)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Continental Motors, Inc., John Doe 1-50 - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2895974.) - filed by Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Dennis Alan O'Neal, Deceased), Fred Cohen(Executor of the Estate of Debra Dee O'Neal, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen et al v. Continental Motors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Sherri R. Ginger
Represented By: Andrea Schoch Brooks
Represented By: Lacey D. Smith
Represented By: Timothy A. Heisterhagen
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Cohen
Represented By: Joseph James Farnan, III
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Cynthia M. Devers
Represented By: Michael S. Miska
Represented By: Arthur Alan Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?