Curtis v. Wright Medical Group N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Marcy Curtis
Defendant: J. Patrick Mackin, Stryker Corporation, David D. Stevens, Robert J. Palmisano, Amy S. Paul, Wright Medical Group N.V., John L. Miclot, Richard F. Wallman, Elizabeth H. Weatherman, Stryker B.V., Kevin C. O'Boyle and Gary D. Blackford
Case Number: 1:2020cv00509
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants' to Respond to the Complaint to July 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2020. (nms)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants' to Respond to the Complaint to July 30, 2020 - filed by Marcy Curtis. (Long, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For Wright Medical Group N.V. waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For David D. Stevens waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For Richard F. Wallman waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For Elizabeth H. Weatherman waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For Robert J. Palmisano waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For Amy S. Paul waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For John L. Miclot waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For Kevin C. O'Boyle waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For Gary D. Blackford waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marcy Curtis: For J. Patrick Mackin waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Long, Brian)
April 15, 2020 No Summons Issued. (lak)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT - filed with Jury Demand against Gary D. Blackford, J. Patrick Mackin, John L. Miclot, Kevin C. O'Boyle, Robert J. Palmisano, Amy S. Paul, David D. Stevens, Stryker B.V., Stryker Corporation, Richard F. Wallman, Elizabeth H. Weatherman, Wright Medical Group N.V. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2899993.) - filed by Marcy Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Wright Medical Group N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Patrick Mackin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Palmisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy S. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Miclot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F. Wallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth H. Weatherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin C. O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D. Blackford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy Curtis
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?