Swirlate IP LLC v. ResMed, Inc.
Plaintiff: Swirlate IP LLC
Defendant: ResMed, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00556
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,154,961 ;7,567,622. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(fms)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Swirlate IP LLC, ***Civil Case Terminated. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/11/2020. (fms)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Swirlate IP LLC as to ResMed Inc (Chong, Jimmy)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Swirlate IP LLC. ResMed, Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Chong, Jimmy)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 15, 2020 filed by ResMed, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: ResMed, Inc. answer due 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/11/2020. (fms)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 15, 2020 - filed by ResMed, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian)
May 11, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Swirlate IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Swirlate IP LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/5/2020. (nmf)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Swirlate IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chong, Jimmy)
April 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ResMed, Inc. on 4/24/2020. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (lak)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Swirlate IP LLC. (lak)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,154,961 ;7,567,622. (lak)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against ResMed, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2906290.) - filed by Swirlate IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swirlate IP LLC v. ResMed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ResMed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swirlate IP LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?