Mujae Group, Inc. v. Spotify USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mujae Group, Inc.
Defendant: Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A., Spotify Ltd and Spotify USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00596
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Healey Cramer on behalf of Spotify AB, Spotify Ltd, Spotify Technology S.A., Spotify USA Inc. (Cramer, Kristen)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Kathryn Severance on behalf of Spotify AB, Spotify Ltd, Spotify Technology S.A., Spotify USA Inc. (Severance, Dana)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to July 15, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Spotify AB answer due 7/15/2020; Spotify Ltd answer due 7/15/2020; Spotify Technology S.A. answer due 7/15/2020; Spotify USA Inc. answer due 7/15/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/8/2020. (dlw)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to July 15, 2020 - filed by Mujae Group, Inc.. (Morrison, Susan)
May 28, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Incorrect PDF Uploaded on Previous Docket Entry. (apk)
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT for the Mailing of Process to Spotify Technology S.A. (apk)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT for the Mailing of Process to Spotify, LTD (apk)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT for the Mailing of Process to Spotify AB (apk)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 PRAECIPE filed by Susan E. Morrison on behalf of Mujae Group, Inc. requesting Clerk to issue Spotify Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Susan E. Morrison, #2 Summons to Spotify Ltd)(Morrison, Susan) Modified on 5/13/2020 (dlw).
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 PRAECIPE filed by Susan E. Morrison on behalf of Mujae Group, Inc. requesting Clerk to issue Spotify AB (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Susan E. Morrison, #2 Summons to Spotify AB)(Morrison, Susan) Modified on 5/13/2020 (dlw).
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 PRAECIPE filed by Susan E. Morrison on behalf of Mujae Group, Inc. requesting Clerk to issue Spotify Technology S.A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Susan E. Morrison, #2 Summons)(Morrison, Susan) Modified on 5/13/2020 (dlw).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Esha Bandyopadhyay, Juanita R. Brooks, Lawrence K. Kolodney, Kayleigh E. McGlynn, Cheryl Wang and Michael T. Zoppo filed by Mujae Group, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/7/2020. (dlw)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mujae Group, Inc.: For Spotify USA Inc. waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Morrison, Susan)
May 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Esha Bandyopadhyay, Juanita R. Brooks, Lawrence K. Kolodney, Kayleigh E. McGlynn, Cheryl Wang and Michael T. Zoppo - filed by Mujae Group, Inc.. (Morrison, Susan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Spotify USA Inc. on 4/30/2020. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (lak)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mujae Group, Inc.. (lak)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR THEFT OF TRADE SECRETS, MISAPPROPRIATION, AND UNFAIR COMPETITION - filed with Jury Demand against Spotify AB, Spotify Ltd, Spotify Technology S.A., Spotify USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2910714.) - filed by Mujae Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mujae Group, Inc. v. Spotify USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify AB
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Kristen Healey Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify Technology S.A.
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Kristen Healey Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify Ltd
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Kristen Healey Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify USA Inc.
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Kristen Healey Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mujae Group, Inc.
Represented By: Susan E. Morrison
Represented By: Kelly A Del Dotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?