Guliyev v. Asure Software, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Orkhan Guliyev
Defendant: W. Carl Drew, Patrick Goepel, David Sandberg, Bjorn Reynolds, Charles Lathrop, Jr., Daniel Gill, Asure Software, Inc. and Bradford Oberwager
Case Number: 1:2020cv00607
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys William J. Fields, Christopher J. Kupka, Samir Shukurov for Orkhan Guliyev added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
June 9, 2020 Set Briefing Schedule: re #11 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses - per D.I. #9 , Answering Brief due 7/7/2020; Reply Brief due 7/21/2020 (dlw)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William J. Fields, Christopher J. Kupka, and Samir Shukurov filed by Orkhan Guliyev. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/9/2020. (dlw)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Brian E. Farnan re #12 Opening Brief in Support by Orkhan Guliyev. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 6/9/2020 (dlw).
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of William J. Fields re #12 Opening Brief in Support by Orkhan Guliyev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 6/9/2020 (dlw).
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Orkhan Guliyev. Answering Brief/Response due date per Stipulation and Order is 7/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 6/9/2020 (dlw).
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses - filed by Orkhan Guliyev. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William J. Fields, Christopher J. Kupka, and Samir Shukurov - filed by Orkhan Guliyev. (Farnan, Brian)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SO ORDERED re #8 Stipulation of Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/19/2020. (dlw)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Orkhan Guliyev. (Farnan, Brian)
May 8, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The 5/8/2020 Oral Order has been amended to add a Reply Brief deadline and a provision that Plaintiff shall provide a copy of the Oral Order to all Defendants. (dlw)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephone Conference is set for 5/20/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Counsel shall provide a dial-in for the teleconference by emailing this Court's judicial administrator. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file an answering brief for #4 the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 5/15/2020 and Plaintiff may file a reply brief on or before 5/18/2020 (Set Briefing Schedule: re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Answering Brief due 5/15/2020; Reply Brief due 5/18/2020). IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide a copy of this Oral Order to all Defendants. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/8/2020. (dlw) Modified on 5/8/2020 (dlw).
May 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orkhan Guliyev. Asure Software, Inc. served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020; W. Carl Drew served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020; Daniel Gill served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020; Patrick Goepel served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020; Charles Lathrop, Jr served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020; Bradford Oberwager served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020; Bjorn Reynolds served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020; David Sandberg served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Farnan, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of William J. Fields re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Orkhan Guliyev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 5/8/2020 (dlw).
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Orkhan Guliyev. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS-filed with Jury Demand against Asure Software, Inc., W. Carl Drew, Daniel Gill, Patrick Goepel, Charles Lathrop, Jr, Bradford Oberwager, Bjorn Reynolds, David Sandberg - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2915211.) - filed by Orkhan Guliyev. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guliyev v. Asure Software, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Carl Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Goepel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bjorn Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Lathrop, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asure Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford Oberwager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orkhan Guliyev
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: William J. Fields
Represented By: Samir Shukurov
Represented By: Christopher J. Kupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?