Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH et al v. ROSS Intelligence Inc. Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by Thomson Reuters against legal research startup ROSS Intelligence alleging that it surreptitiously stole content from Westlaw to build its own competing legal research product.

Plaintiff: West Publishing Corporation and Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH
Defendant: ROSS Intelligence Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00613
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Argument by Telephone Conference held on 10/30/2020. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear argument by teleconference on the motion to dismiss on October 30, 2020 beginning at 11:00 a.m. Each side will be allocated up to forty-five (45) minutes to present its argument. Any party wishing to refer to slides or other materials shall provide a copy to the Court no later than 4:00 p.m. the day before the hearing. The parties can access the teleconference by dialing 877-336-1829 and using the access code 1408971. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/14/20. (ntl)
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH, West Publishing Corporation re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Flynn, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ROSS Intelligence Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11)(Moore, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #15 Answering Brief in Opposition, -- Declaration of Dale M. Cendali -- by Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH, West Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH, West Publishing Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/17/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (1) for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint (D.I. 11) and (2) for Defendant to file a reply to August 10, 2020 and August 20, 2020, respectively filed by West Publishing Corporation, Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/20/20. (ntl)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (1) for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint (D.I. 11) and (2) for Defendant to file a reply to August 10, 2020 and August 20, 2020, respectively - filed by Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH, West Publishing Corporation. (Flynn, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by ROSS Intelligence Inc.. (Moore, David)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ROSS Intelligence Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/27/2020. (Moore, David)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by ROSS Intelligence Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David)
June 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Kayvan M. Ghaffari, Joshua M Rychlinski, Gabriel M. Ramsey, and Mark A. Klapow for ROSS Intelligence Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
June 1, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric A. Loverro for Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH, for West Publishing Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 1, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joshua Simmons for Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH,for West Publishing Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 1, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dale M. Cendali for Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH, for West Publishing Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua M. Rychlinski, Mark A. Klapow, Gabriel M. Ramsey, and Kayvan M. Ghaffari of Crowell & Moring LLP filed by ROSS Intelligence Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/1/20. (ntl)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua M. Rychlinski, Mark A. Klapow, Gabriel M. Ramsey, and Kayvan M. Ghaffari of Crowell & Moring LLP - filed by ROSS Intelligence Inc.. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 13, 2020 filed by ROSS Intelligence Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/22/20. (ntl)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 13, 2020 - filed by ROSS Intelligence Inc.. (Moore, David)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dale M. Cendali, Joshua L. Simmons, and Eric A. Loverro filed by West Publishing Corporation, Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/18/20. (ntl)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s) (See Attached List) (AMENDED). (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dale M. Cendali, Joshua L. Simmons, and Eric A. Loverro - filed by Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH, West Publishing Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Publishing Corporation, Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH. ROSS Intelligence Inc. served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Thomson Reuters Corporation for Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH and West Publishing Corporation filed by Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH and West Publishing Corporation. (mal)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s) see attached list. (mal)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against ROSS Intelligence Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2919270.) - filed by West Publishing Corporation, Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against ROSS Intelligence Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2919270.) - filed by West Publishing Corporation, Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH et al v. ROSS Intelligence Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Joshua Simmons
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Eric A. Loverro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Joshua Simmons
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Eric A. Loverro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSS Intelligence Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Klapow
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Kayvan M. Ghaffari
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: Joshua M Rychlinski
Represented By: Gabriel M. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?